Smith v. The Guardian Life Insurance Company of America
Plaintiff: RICHELLE SMITH
Defendant: The Guardian Life Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 1:2023cv20553
Filed: February 10, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Lisette M Reid
Referring Judge: Kathleen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 7, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 7, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name by Latanae L. Parker (Parker, Latanae)
March 20, 2023 Filing 10 Defendant's Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Guardian Life Insurance Company of America (Parker, Latanae)
March 20, 2023 Filing 9 Defendant's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by The Guardian Life Insurance Company of America. (Parker, Latanae)
March 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #7 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to a Complaint or Other Case Initiating Document. Defendant shall file its Response/Answer on or by March 21, 2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 3/2/2023. (ama)
March 2, 2023 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint, by The Guardian Life Insurance Company of America. Attorney Latanae L. Parker added to party The Guardian Life Insurance Company of America(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Parker, Latanae)
February 17, 2023 Filing 6 Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by RICHELLE SMITH (Ortiz, Nick)
February 14, 2023 Filing 5 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by RICHELLE SMITH. The Guardian Life Insurance Company of America served on 2/14/2023, response/answer due 3/7/2023. (Ortiz, Nick)
February 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF REFERRAL AND SETTING TRIAL DATE: ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid for Report and Recommendation., SCHEDULING ORDER: ( Jury Trial set for 2/12/2024 in Miami Division before Judge Kathleen M. Williams., Calendar Call set for 2/6/2024 11:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Kathleen M. Williams.) Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 2/13/2023. See attached document for full details. (nan) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
February 13, 2023 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to The Guardian Life Insurance Company of America. (aao)
February 10, 2023 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Kathleen M. Williams. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (aao) Modified date on 2/13/2023 (aao).
February 10, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The Guardian Life Insurance Company of America. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-16318553, filed by RICHELLE SMITH. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s) SUMMONS FOR DEFENDANT THE GUARDIAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA)(Ortiz, Nick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. The Guardian Life Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHELLE SMITH
Represented By: Nick Anthony Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Guardian Life Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Latanae L. Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?