FORIS DAX, INC. v. GARCIA
Petitioner: FORIS DAX, INC. doing business as CRYPTO.COM
Respondent: LP GARCIA
Case Number: 1:2023cv21702
Filed: May 5, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Lisette M Reid
Referring Judge: Kathleen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09 U.S.C. ยง 0009 Motion to confirm arbitration award
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 31, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER CLOSING CASE. Judgment is entered in favor of FORIS DAX, INC. against LP GARCIA. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 5/31/2023. See attached document for full details. (nlf)
May 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting the Unopposed Petition (Complaint) to Enforce JAMS Fee Award and Dismissal Order Arbitration (DE 1). Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 5/31/2023. See attached document for full details. (nlf)
May 24, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE REGARDING NO OPPOSITION TO ITS PETITION TO CONFIRM by FORIS DAX, INC. re #1 Petition (Complaint) to Enforce/Compel Arbitration, Notice of Lack of Opposition Filed (Weiss, Aaron) Modified text on 5/25/2023 (ebz).
May 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF REFERRAL AND NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE AND PROCEDURES. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid for Pretrial Non-Dispositive Matters. Notice of Court Practice. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 5/8/2023. See attached document for full details. (nan)
May 8, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE by FORIS DAX, INC. re #1 Petition (Complaint) to Enforce/Compel Arbitration, of Filing Proposed Orders (Attachments: #1 Errata A - Proposed Order Granting Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award, #2 Exhibit B - Proposed Judgment) (Weiss, Aaron)
May 8, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Charles Woodward Throckmorton, V on behalf of FORIS DAX, INC. (Throckmorton, Charles)
May 8, 2023 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by FORIS DAX, INC.. FORIS DAX, INC. waiver sent on 5/5/2023, response/answer due 7/5/2023. (Weiss, Aaron)
May 5, 2023 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to LP GARCIA. (rbe)
May 5, 2023 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Kathleen M. Williams. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (rbe)
May 5, 2023 Filing 1 Petition (Complaint) to Enforce JAMS Fee Award and Dismissal Order Arbitration. Filing fee $402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-16596490, filed by FORIS DAX, INC. d/b/a CRYPTO.COM. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Terms and Conditions between Crypto.com and Garcia, #2 Exhibit B - JAMS Fee Award and Dismissal Order, #3 Exhibit C - Stipulation between Crypto.com and Garcia, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summon(s))(Weiss, Aaron)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FORIS DAX, INC. v. GARCIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: FORIS DAX, INC. doing business as CRYPTO.COM
Represented By: Charles Woodward Throckmorton, V
Represented By: James Samuel Czodli
Represented By: Aaron Stenzler Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: LP GARCIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?