Schuman v. Royal Caribbean Cruises, Ltd..
Plaintiff: Stephen Schuman
Defendant: ROYAL CARIBBEAN CRUISES, LTD. doing business as ROYAL CARIBBEAN GROUP
Case Number: 1:2023cv24404
Filed: November 17, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Federico A Moreno
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2024 Filing 8 Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Royal Caribbean Cruises, Ltd. (Ginsberg, Randy)
January 3, 2024 Filing 7 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Royal Caribbean Cruises, Ltd.. (Ginsberg, Randy)
December 13, 2023 Filing 6 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Stephen Schuman. ROYAL CARIBBEAN CRUISES, LTD. served on 11/22/2023, response/answer due 1/3/2024. (Smith, Heather)
December 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #4 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Response due 1/3/2024. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 12/13/2023. (jl00)
December 11, 2023 Filing 4 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint by ROYAL CARIBBEAN CRUISES, LTD.. Attorney Randy Scott Ginsberg added to party ROYAL CARIBBEAN CRUISES, LTD.(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ginsberg, Randy)
November 20, 2023 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to ROYAL CARIBBEAN CRUISES, LTD. (bb)
November 17, 2023 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Federico A. Moreno. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (bb)
November 17, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against ROYAL CARIBBEAN CRUISES, LTD.. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-17083569, filed by Stephen Schuman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Smith, Heather)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schuman v. Royal Caribbean Cruises, Ltd..
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Schuman
Represented By: Heather Lynn Smith
Represented By: Jacqueline Garcell
Represented By: Jason Robert Margulies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROYAL CARIBBEAN CRUISES, LTD. doing business as ROYAL CARIBBEAN GROUP
Represented By: Randy Scott Ginsberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?