Birth v. Royal Caribbean Group
Plaintiff: Falon Birth
Defendant: Royal Caribbean Group
Case Number: 1:2023cv24456
Filed: November 22, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Jose E Martinez
Referring Judge: Eduardo I Sanchez
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1333 Admiralty
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2024 Filing 9 REPORT REGARDING JOINT CONFERRAL REPORT by Falon Birth (Aronfeld, Spencer)
December 26, 2023 Filing 8 Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates by Falon Birth identifying Other Affiliate Arch Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Aon Travel Professionals Liability Insurance, Other Affiliate United Healthcare for Falon Birth (Aronfeld, Spencer)
December 19, 2023 Filing 7 Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Royal Caribbean Group (Probst, Bryan)
December 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER SETTING CIVIL TRIAL DATE AND PRETRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MOTIONS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Jury Trial set for 1/13/2025 09:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Jose E. Martinez., Calendar Call set for 1/9/2025 01:30 PM in Miami Division before Judge Jose E. Martinez. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636, all discovery motions and all motions that relate directly to these motions, such as motions for extension of time, motions for reconsideration, motions for sanctions, and motions for mental or physical examinations, are referred to United States Magistrate Judge Eduardo Sanchez to take all appropriate action. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 12/18/2023. See attached document for full details. (rbe) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
December 18, 2023 Filing 5 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Royal Caribbean Group. Attorney Bryan Edward Probst added to party Royal Caribbean Group(pty:dft). (Probst, Bryan)
November 28, 2023 Filing 4 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Falon Birth. Royal Caribbean Group served on 11/27/2023, response/answer due 12/18/2023. (Aronfeld, Spencer)
November 22, 2023 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Royal Caribbean Group. (rbe)
November 22, 2023 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Jose E. Martinez. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Eduardo I. Sanchez is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (rbe)
November 22, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Royal Caribbean Group. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-17093182, filed by Falon Birth. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s), #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Aronfeld, Spencer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Birth v. Royal Caribbean Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Falon Birth
Represented By: Abby Hernandez Ivey
Represented By: Matthias Masayasu Hayashi
Represented By: Spencer Marc Aronfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royal Caribbean Group
Represented By: Bryan Edward Probst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?