Dezego v. Royal Caribbean Cruises LTD.
Plaintiff: Patricia Dezego
Defendant: Royal Caribbean Cruises, LTD and Royal Caribbean Cruises LTD. doing business as ROYAL CARIBBEAN GROUP
Case Number: 1:2023cv24557
Filed: December 1, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Federico A Moreno
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1333 Admiralty
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL AND ORDER DENYING ALL PENDING MOTIONS AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 1/19/2024. See attached document for full details. (dyg)
January 8, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE of Settlement by Patricia Dezego (Finklehoffe, Carol)
January 8, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by George Sebastian Florez on behalf of Royal Caribbean Cruises LTD.. Attorney George Sebastian Florez added to party Royal Caribbean Cruises LTD.(pty:dft). (Florez, George)
December 28, 2023 Filing 5 Plaintiff's AMENDED COMPLAINT against Royal Caribbean Cruises LTD., filed by Patricia Dezego.(Finklehoffe, Carol)
December 12, 2023 Filing 4 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Patricia Dezego. Royal Caribbean Cruises LTD. served on 12/7/2023, response/answer due 12/28/2023. (Finklehoffe, Carol)
December 4, 2023 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Royal Caribbean Cruises LTD. (rbe)
December 1, 2023 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Federico A. Moreno. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (rbe)
December 1, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR ADVISORY JURY TRIAL against Royal Caribbean Cruises, LTD. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-17113950, filed by Patricia Dezego. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Finklehoffe, Carol)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dezego v. Royal Caribbean Cruises LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Dezego
Represented By: Carol Lynn Finklehoffe
Represented By: Jason Robert Margulies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royal Caribbean Cruises, LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royal Caribbean Cruises LTD. doing business as ROYAL CARIBBEAN GROUP
Represented By: George Sebastian Florez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?