Deveau v. Royal Caribbean Cruises, LTD.
Plaintiff: Heather Deveau
Defendant: Royal Caribbean Cruises, Ltd. doing business as Royal Caribbean Group
Case Number: 1:2023cv24607
Filed: December 6, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Lauren Fleischer Louis
Referring Judge: Rodolfo A Ruiz
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1333 Admiralty
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING JURY TRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Jury Trial set for 12/2/2024 in Miami Division before Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz II. Calendar Call set for 11/26/2024 11:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz II. Amended Pleadings due by 3/4/2024. Discovery due by 6/11/2024. Expert Discovery due by 6/11/2024. Joinder of Parties due by 3/4/2024. Mediation Deadline 6/18/2024. In Limine Motions due by 7/23/2024. Dispositive Motions due by 6/25/2024. Motions due by 6/25/2024. Pretrial Stipulation due by 7/23/2024. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636 and this District's Magistrate Judge Rules, all discovery matters are hereby referred to United States Magistrate Judge Lauren F. Louis. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 1/22/2024. See attached document for full details. (rbe) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
January 19, 2024 Filing 8 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by Royal Caribbean Cruises, LTD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Zubizarreta, Charlotte)
January 19, 2024 Filing 7 Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Heather Deveau (Smith, Heather)
January 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REQUIRING JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES. The parties are directed to prepare and file a joint scheduling report, as required by Local Rule 16.1, by January 19, 2024. In addition, by January 19, 2024, the parties, including governmental parties, must file Certificates of Interested Parties and Corporate Disclosure Statements. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 1/2/2024. See attached document for full details. (rbe)
December 29, 2023 Filing 5 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Royal Caribbean Cruises, LTD.. Attorney Carlos Javier Chardon added to party Royal Caribbean Cruises, LTD.(pty:dft). (Chardon, Carlos)
December 13, 2023 Filing 4 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Heather Deveau. Royal Caribbean Cruises, LTD. served on 12/8/2023, response/answer due 12/29/2023. (Smith, Heather)
December 7, 2023 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Royal Caribbean Cruises, LTD. (rbe)
December 6, 2023 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lauren F. Louis is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (rbe)
December 6, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against Royal Caribbean Cruises, Ltd.. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-17123947, filed by Heather Deveau. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Smith, Heather)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Deveau v. Royal Caribbean Cruises, LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Deveau
Represented By: Heather Lynn Smith
Represented By: Jacqueline Garcell
Represented By: Jason Robert Margulies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royal Caribbean Cruises, Ltd. doing business as Royal Caribbean Group
Represented By: Carlos Javier Chardon
Represented By: Charlotte Paige Zubizarreta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?