Duffy Archive Limited v. Nailpoint Art LLC et al
Plaintiff: Duffy Archive Limited
Defendant: Nailpoint Art LLC doing business as The Wolberg Studio and George Wolberg
Case Number: 1:2024cv21194
Filed: March 29, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Rodolfo A Ruiz
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 0501 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 14, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2024 Filing 7 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Duffy Archive Limited. George Wolberg served on 5/10/2024, response/answer due 5/31/2024. (Quintero, Marian)
May 14, 2024 Filing 6 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Duffy Archive Limited. Nailpoint Art LLC served on 5/10/2024, response/answer due 5/31/2024. (Quintero, Marian)
May 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO PERFECT SERVICE. On or before June 27, 2024, Plaintiff shall perfect service upon Defendants. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II, on 5/2/2024. See attached document for full details. (caw)
April 1, 2024 Filing 4 FORM AO 121 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. COPYRIGHT OFFICE. (caw)
April 1, 2024 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Nailpoint Art LLC, and George Wolberg. (caw)
March 29, 2024 Filing 2 Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lauren F. Louis is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (caw)
March 29, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nailpoint Art LLC, George Wolberg. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-17409543, filed by Duffy Archive Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Registration, #2 Exhibit 2 - Infringement, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summon(s) as to George Wolberg, #5 Summon(s) as to Nailpoint Art LLC dba The Wolberg Studio)(Quintero, Marian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Duffy Archive Limited v. Nailpoint Art LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Duffy Archive Limited
Represented By: Marian V. Quintero
Represented By: Joel Benjamin Rothman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nailpoint Art LLC doing business as The Wolberg Studio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Wolberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?