BASSAT v. DANA
Defendant: SAPIR SWISSA DANA
Petitioner: ISRAEL BASSAT
Case Number: 1:2024cv24340
Filed: November 5, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Cecilia M Altonaga
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. § 11601 International Child Abduction Remedies Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #23 Motion for Remote Testimony. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 12/23/2024. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
December 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 32 REPLY to Response to Motion re #23 Second MOTION to Amend/Correct FOR REMOTE TESTIMONY AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW filed by ISRAEL BASSAT. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Israel Bassat in Support of Petitioner's Reply, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Hagit Oaknin Lessens)(Kauffman, Ronald)
December 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 31 RESPONSE in Opposition re #23 Second MOTION to Amend/Correct FOR REMOTE TESTIMONY AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW filed by SAPIR SWISSA DANA. Replies due by 12/20/2024. (Turk, Stephanie)
December 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 30 NOTICE OF FILING PROPOSED ORDER ON PETITIONER ISRAEL BASSAT'S SECOND AMENDED MOTION FOR REMOTE TESTIMONY by ISRAEL BASSAT re #23 Second MOTION to Amend/Correct FOR REMOTE TESTIMONY AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW (Kauffman, Ronald)
December 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #28 Motion to Continue. Final Hearing set for 1/13/2025 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga, and continuing January 14, 2025, starting at 9:30 a.m. The status conference scheduled for December 13, 2024 is cancelled. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 12/12/2024. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
December 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Final Hearing re #25 Order Setting/Resetting/Cancelling Hearing, by SAPIR SWISSA DANA. Responses due by 12/26/2024. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Rivera, Kimberly)
December 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 27 PAPERLESS NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 12/13/2024 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. The parties may appear by Zoom, Meeting ID: 160 5041 7377, Passcode: 052922. (ps1)
December 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Respondent Sapir Dana's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by SAPIR SWISSA DANA. (Turk, Stephanie)
December 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Order Setting Hearing on Petition for 1/8/2025 08:30 AM in Miami Division before Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga, and continue, as needed, on January 10, 2025, at 8:30 a.m. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 12/2/2024. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
November 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 24 PAPERLESS ORDER denying as moot #15 Motion. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga (CMA)
November 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Second MOTION to Amend/Correct FOR REMOTE TESTIMONY AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW by ISRAEL BASSAT. Responses due by 12/13/2024. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Petitioner's Declaration as to Travel Restrictions, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Petitioner's Declaration - Divorce Judgment and Custody Order, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B to Petitioner's Declaration - Urgent Motion and Israeli Enforcement and Collection Authority Ruling, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C to Petitioner's Declaration - Israeli Passport and Travel Restrictions)(Lacayo-Valle, Raquel)
November 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 22 RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 Amended MOTION Remote Testimony of a Party Petitioner Israel Bassat filed by SAPIR SWISSA DANA. Replies due by 12/4/2024. (Rivera, Kimberly)
November 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kimberly Rae Rivera on behalf of SAPIR SWISSA DANA. Attorney Kimberly Rae Rivera added to party SAPIR SWISSA DANA(pty:dft). (Rivera, Kimberly)
November 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Motion to Continue. The parties shall contact the Courtroom Deputy to arrange a mutually convenient day and time for the final hearing. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 11/25/2024. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
November 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Final Hearing re #8 Order,, Set/Reset Hearings,, Order Referring Case to Volunteer Attorney Program, #12 Order Referring Case to Volunteer Attorney Program,, Set/Reset Hearings, by SAPIR SWISSA DANA. Responses due by 12/9/2024. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Turk, Stephanie)
November 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stephanie L. Turk on behalf of SAPIR SWISSA DANA. Attorney Stephanie L. Turk added to party SAPIR SWISSA DANA(pty:dft). (Turk, Stephanie)
November 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER PROVIDING INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE LITIGANT. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 11/20/2024. See attached document for full details. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (ps1)
November 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER requiring expedited briefing on #15 Amended MOTION Remote Testimony of a Party Petitioner Israel Bassat filed by ISRAEL BASSAT; Responses due by 11/27/2024, Replies due by 11/29/2024. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 11/20/2024. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
November 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Amended MOTION Remote Testimony of a Party Petitioner Israel Bassat by ISRAEL BASSAT. (Lacayo-Valle, Raquel)
November 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER denying #13 Motion for Remote Testimony. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 11/19/2024. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
November 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 First MOTION Remote Testimony of a Party Petitioner Israel Bassat by ISRAEL BASSAT. (Lacayo-Valle, Raquel)
November 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 DUPLICATE-ORDER setting a final hearing on Petition for 12/9/2024 at 10:00 AM in Miami Division before Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga, and REFERRING CASE to Volunteer Attorney Program. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 11/13/2024. See attached document for full details. Text Modified on 11/13/2024 (mee). Duplicate of d.e. #8 Order.
November 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Change of Telephone/Fax Number; by SAPIR SWISSA DANA (phone number updated) (pc)
November 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 RELEASE OF EXHIBITS release of Passports to Sapir Swissa Dana's Israeli and American Respondent shall return her Israeli passport to the Clerk of Court on or before Friday November 15, 2024. released to Sapir Swissa Dana (pc)
November 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CLERK'S Notice of Maintaining Israeli passport( Sapir Swissa Dana's) received on 11/13/24 from Defendant Re D.E. #8 Order,, Set/Reset Hearings,, Order Referring Case to Volunteer Attorney Program,. (rrs)
November 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER The parties shall appear on December 9, 2024, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 13-3 of the United States District Court for the Southern District of Florida (Miami Division), located at Wilkie D. Ferguson, Jr. U.S. Courthouse, 400 North Miami Avenue, Miami, Florida 33128, for a final hearing on the Petition. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Volunteer Attorney Program Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 11/13/2024. See attached document for full details. (mee)
November 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga: Show Cause Hearing held on 11/13/2024. Total time in court: 25 minutes. Attorney Appearance: Raquel Alejandra Lacayo-Valle. Other appearances: Seriy Dana and Sapir Swissa Dana. Court Reporter: Stephanie McCarn, 305-523-5518 / Stephanie_McCarn@flsd.uscourts.gov. Text Modified on 11/13/2024 (mee).
November 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE as to #4 Order on Motion for Order to Show Cause,. (pc)
November 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Clerk's Notice Re Expedited Review - Pursuant to Court policy, petitions filed under The Hague Convention and ICARA should be resolved within six-weeks from the initial filing of the petition. See Internal Operating Procedures, Section 2.18.00, on the Courts website. (vjk)
November 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SHOW CAUSE ORDER granting #3 Motion for Order to Show Cause. Show Cause Hearing set for 11/13/2024 at 9:00 AM in Miami Division before Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 11/5/2024. See attached document for full details. (mee)
November 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Plaintiff's MOTION for Order to Show Cause and Expedite Proceedings by ISRAEL BASSAT. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order proposed order)(Kauffman, Ronald)
November 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (pc)
November 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT Petition for Return to Israel under Hague Convention against SAPIR SWISSA DANA. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-17961811, filed by ISRAEL BASSAT. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Hague Application, #3 Exhibit Birth Certificates, #4 Exhibit Foreign Custody Decree, #5 Exhibit Foreign Court Order, #6 Exhibit Text Communications, #7 Exhibit Foreign Exit Certificate, #8 Exhibit Hague Authorization, #9 Exhibit Photos)(Kauffman, Ronald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BASSAT v. DANA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ISRAEL BASSAT
Represented By: Ronald Harrison Kauffman
Represented By: Raquel Alejandra Lacayo-Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAPIR SWISSA DANA
Represented By: Kimberly Rae Rivera
Represented By: Stephanie L. Turk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?