Ofer v. 1434 Collins, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Raziel Ofer
Defendant: 1434 Collins, LLC, Roniel Rodriguez, Roniel Rodriguez IV PA and Metropolitan Mortgage Company, LLC
Case Number: 1:2024cv24478
Filed: November 13, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Roy K Altman
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE of Filing re Related Complaint Concerning the Illegal Access to his Electronic Device by Raziel Ofer (cds)
December 12, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Roniel Rodriguez, IV on behalf of 1434 Collins, LLC, Roniel Rodriguez, Roniel Rodriguez IV PA. Attorney Roniel Rodriguez, IV added to party 1434 Collins, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Roniel Rodriguez, IV added to party Roniel Rodriguez(pty:dft), Attorney Roniel Rodriguez, IV added to party Roniel Rodriguez IV PA (pty:dft). (Rodriguez, Roniel)
December 3, 2024 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Roniel Rodriguez. (cds)
November 19, 2024 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to 1434 Collins, LLC, Metropolitan Mortgage Company, LLC, Roniel Rodriguez IV PA. (cds)
November 18, 2024 Filing 6 Clerks Notice of Receipt of Filing Fee received on 11/18/2024 in the amount of $ 405.00, receipt number FLS294780. (vt)
November 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER re REQUIRING PAYMENT OF FILING FEE OR FILING OF MOTION TO PROCEED IFP WITH DETAILED AFFIDAVIT. Filing Fee due by 11/27/2024. Motions due by 11/27/2024. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 11/18/2024. See attached document for full details. (Attachments: #1 IFP (Long Form)) (cds)
November 18, 2024 Civil Case Terminated. Administratively Closing Case. PER DE#5 (cds)
November 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER PROVIDING INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE LITIGANTS. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 11/15/2024. See attached document for full details. (wce)
November 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER IN CASES WITH MULTIPLE DEFENDANTS. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 11/15/2024. See attached document for full details. (cds)
November 13, 2024 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Roy K. Altman. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Enjolique A. Lett is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jas)
November 13, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 1434 Collins, LLC, Metropolitan Mortgage Company, LLC, Roniel Rodriguez, Roniel Rodriguez IV PA. Filing fees $405.00, No IFP, Not Paid, filed by Raziel Ofer. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ofer v. 1434 Collins, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1434 Collins, LLC
Represented By: Roniel Rodriguez, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roniel Rodriguez
Represented By: Roniel Rodriguez, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roniel Rodriguez IV PA
Represented By: Roniel Rodriguez, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Mortgage Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raziel Ofer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?