Prime Property & Casualty Insurance Inc v. A&R Coronados Service LLC et al
Plaintiff: Prime Property & Casualty Insurance Inc
Defendant: Meryl Arteaga Leal, Gustavo Alberto La Nuez Vargas, A&R Coronados Trucking Corporation and A&R Coronados Service LLC
Case Number: 1:2024cv24513
Filed: November 15, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Rodolfo A Ruiz
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 2201 Declaratory Judgment (Insurance)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daniel C Shatz on behalf of Prime Property & Casualty Insurance Inc. Attorney Daniel C Shatz added to party Prime Property & Casualty Insurance Inc(pty:pla). (Shatz, Daniel)
January 6, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE of Compliance Affidavit Complying with Service of Process on A&R Coronados Service LLC and A&R Coronados Trucking Corporation, Through the Secretary of State in accordance with Fla. Stat. Ann 48.062(3) and 48.101 by Prime Property & Casualty Insurance Inc re #11 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint,, filed by Prime Property & Casualty Insurance Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Division of Corporation Records, #2 Exhibit B - Secretary of State Acceptance Letters, #3 Exhibit C - Certified Mail Receipts) (Savino, Brittney)
January 2, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 19 PAPERLESS ORDER on #17 Clerk's Entry of Default as to Meryl Arteaga Leal and #18 Clerk's Entry of Default as to Gustavo Alberto La Nuez Vargas. Plaintiff filed the Complaint on November 15, 2024, [ECF No. 1], served Defendant Meryl Arteaga Leal ("Leal") on November 19, 2024, [ECF No. 4], and served Defendant Gustavo Alberto La Nuez Vargas ("Vargas") on November 20, 2024, [ECF No. 12]. Per Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(a)(1)(A), Leal's response was initially due on or before December 10, 2024, and Vargas's response was initially due on or before December 11, 2024. However, on December 11, 2024, the Court entered an Order Requiring Combined Responses ("Order") providing that all Defendants shall submit a single combined response or separate answers within the time allowed for the last-served Defendant to respond. [ECF No. 6]. The Order also applied as a nunc pro tunc extension of time for Leal, whose time to respond otherwise already would have passed. See id. at 1, n.1. To date, there is no indication in the record that Plaintiff has served Defendant A&R Coronados Service LLC or Defendant A&R Coronados Trucking Corporation. Because Plaintiff has not served all Defendants, the time for Leal and Vargas to respond to the Complaint has not yet passed. Accordingly, the Clerk's Entry of Default as to Defendant Meryl Arteaga Leal, [ECF No. 17], and the Clerk's Entry of Default as to Defendant Gustavo Alberto La Nuez Vargas, [ECF No. 18], are hereby VACATED. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 1/2/2025. (jgz)
January 2, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 18 VACATED PER ORDER DE 19 -Clerk's Entry of Default as to Alberto La Nuez Vargas - Motions Terminated: #15 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default, Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 1/2/2025. (drz) Modified text on 1/3/2025 (drz).
January 2, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 17 VACATED PER ORDER DE 19 -Clerk's Entry of Default as to Meryl Arteaga Leal - Motions Terminated: #14 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 1/2/2025. (drz) Modified text on 1/3/2025 (drz).
January 2, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #13 Ronald Lee Kammer's Unopposed Motion to Withdraw as Counsel. Ronald Lee Kammer is hereby DISCHARGED of all further responsibilities related to Plaintiff. The Clerk is directed to remove Ronald Lee Kammer from the CM/ECF electronic list of counsel to be served in this action. Pedro E. Hernandez and Brittney D. Savino of Hinshaw & Culbertson LLP shall remain counsel of record for Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 1/2/2025. (jgz)
January 2, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default as to Gustavo Alberto La Nuez Vargas by Prime Property & Casualty Insurance Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Non-Military Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order of Default)(Savino, Brittney)
January 2, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default as to Meryl Arteaga Leal by Prime Property & Casualty Insurance Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Non-Military Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order of Default)(Savino, Brittney)
December 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Ronald L. Kammer for / by Prime Property & Casualty Insurance Inc. Responses due by 1/13/2025. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order A - Proposed Order on Motion to Withdraw)(Kammer, Ronald)
December 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Prime Property & Casualty Insurance Inc. Gustavo Alberto La Nuez Vargas served on 11/20/2024, response/answer due 12/11/2024. (Savino, Brittney)
December 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Summons Issued as to A&R Coronados Service LLC, A&R Coronados Trucking Corporation. (drz)
December 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) to A&R Coronados Trucking Corporation by serving the Secretary of State by Prime Property & Casualty Insurance Inc (Savino, Brittney)
December 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) to A&R Coronados Service LLC by Serving the Secretary of State by Prime Property & Casualty Insurance Inc (Savino, Brittney)
December 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Summons (Affidavit) Returned Unexecuted by Prime Property & Casualty Insurance Inc as to A&R Coronados Service LLC. (Savino, Brittney)
December 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Summons (Affidavit) Returned Unexecuted by Prime Property & Casualty Insurance Inc as to A&R Coronados Trucking Corporation. (Savino, Brittney)
December 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REQUIRING COMBINED RESPONSES. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 12/11/2024. See attached document for full details. (jgz)
November 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Pedro E. Hernandez on behalf of Prime Property & Casualty Insurance Inc. Attorney Pedro E. Hernandez added to party Prime Property & Casualty Insurance Inc(pty:pla). (Hernandez, Pedro)
November 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Prime Property & Casualty Insurance Inc. Meryl Arteaga Leal served on 11/19/2024, response/answer due 12/10/2024. (Savino, Brittney)
November 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Summons Issued as to A&R Coronados Service LLC, A&R Coronados Trucking Corporation, Meryl Arteaga Leal, Gustavo Alberto La Nuez Vargas. (ar24)
November 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lauren F. Louis is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (ar24)
November 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT against A&R Coronados Service LLC, A&R Coronados Trucking Corporation, Meryl Arteaga Leal, Gustavo Alberto La Nuez Vargas. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-17986528, filed by Prime Property & Casualty Insurance Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summon(s) A&R Coronados Service LLC, #5 Summon(s) A&R Coronados Trucking Corporation, #6 Summon(s) Gustavo Alberto La Nuez Vargas, #7 Summon(s) Meryl Arteaga Leal)(Kammer, Ronald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Prime Property & Casualty Insurance Inc v. A&R Coronados Service LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meryl Arteaga Leal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gustavo Alberto La Nuez Vargas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A&R Coronados Trucking Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A&R Coronados Service LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Prime Property & Casualty Insurance Inc
Represented By: Brittney D Savino
Represented By: Pedro E. Hernandez
Represented By: Daniel C Shatz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?