GOJA, LLC v. EDENS GARDEN ESSENTIALS CORPORATION
Plaintiff: GOJA, LLC
Defendant: EDENS GARDEN ESSENTIALS CORPORATION
Case Number: 1:2025cv20753
Filed: February 18, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Beth Bloom
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. § 1051 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 17, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2025 Filing 20 Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by EDENS GARDEN ESSENTIALS CORPORATION (Nelles, Matthew)
April 16, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 19 PAPERLESS ORDER THIS CAUSE is before the Court upon a sua sponte review of the record. On February 19, 2025, this Court entered its Order Requiring Scheduling Report and Certificate of Interested Parties, ECF No. #5 , requiring that, pursuant to Local Rule 16.1, the parties prepare and file a joint scheduling report within twenty-one days of an appearance by a Defendant. To date the parties have not complied. The parties shall have until April 23, 2025, to file their joint scheduling report. Failure to comply will result in sanctions, including, but not limited to, dismissal without prejudice without further notice. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (ap01)
April 14, 2025 Set Deadlines per DE 18 Order as to #14 Motion. Response due by 4/30/2025. (kpe)
April 14, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 18 PAPERLESS ORDER granting Plaintiff's Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Motion to Dismiss, ECF No. #17 . Plaintiff shall file its response to the Motion to Dismiss on or before April 30, 2025. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (ap01)
April 14, 2025 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #14 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, by GOJA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(McLaughlin, Victoria)
April 2, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PAPERLESS ORDER granting Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Motion to Dismiss, ECF No. #15 . Plaintiff shall file its response to the Motion to Dismiss on or before April 16, 2025. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (ap01)
April 2, 2025 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #14 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, by GOJA, LLC. (McLaughlin, Victoria)
April 2, 2025 Set Deadlines per DE 16 Order as to #14 Motion. Response due by 4/16/2025. (kpe)
March 19, 2025 Filing 14 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, by EDENS GARDEN ESSENTIALS CORPORATION. Attorney Matthew Scott Nelles added to party EDENS GARDEN ESSENTIALS CORPORATION(pty:dft). Responses due by 4/2/2025. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Head Ease Trademark Registration, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Grace Martin)(Nelles, Matthew)
March 12, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Stewart N. Mesher; granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Darlene F. Ghavimi. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (ap01)
March 12, 2025 Filing 12 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Darlene F. Ghavimi. Pay.gov Agency Tracking ID FLSDC-18273030. Filing Fee $ 250.00 by GOJA, LLC. Responses due by 3/26/2025. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Exhibit Proposed Order)(McLaughlin, Victoria)
March 12, 2025 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Stewart N. Mesher. Pay.gov Agency Tracking ID FLSDC-18273013. Filing Fee $ 250.00 by GOJA, LLC. Responses due by 3/26/2025. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Exhibit Proposed Order)(McLaughlin, Victoria)
March 11, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PAPERLESS ORDER denying #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Stewart N. Mesher; denying #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Darlene F. Ghavimi. The Motions fail to comply with Section 3J(1) of the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures and Local Rule 5.1(b) because the name of the attorney e-filing the Motions via their CM/ECF login does not match the name of the attorney on the signature block of the Motions. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (ap01)
March 11, 2025 Filing 9 Clerk's Notice to Filer re #7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Stewart N. Mesher. Filing Fee $ 250.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-18273013, #8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Darlene F. Ghavimi. Filing Fee $ 250.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-18273030. Login/Signature Block Violation; CORRECTIVE ACTION REQUIRED WITHIN 3 DAYS - The name of attorney e-filing this document via their CM/ECF login does not match the name of attorney on the signature block of the document. The name used for login must match typed name on signature block of the document. This filing is a violation of Section 3J(1) of CM/ECF Admin Procedures and LR 5.1(b). Filer must File a Notice of Striking, then refile document pursuant to CM/ECF Admin Procedures and Local Rules. (drz)
March 11, 2025 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Darlene F. Ghavimi. Filing Fee $ 250.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-18273030 by GOJA, LLC. Responses due by 3/25/2025. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Exhibit Order Granting Motion to Appear)(Pearce, Victoria)
March 11, 2025 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Stewart N. Mesher. Filing Fee $ 250.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-18273013 by GOJA, LLC. Responses due by 3/25/2025. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Pearce, Victoria)
March 5, 2025 Filing 6 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by GOJA, LLC. EDENS GARDEN ESSENTIALS CORPORATION served on 2/26/2025, response/answer due 3/19/2025. (Pearce, Victoria)
February 19, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 2/19/2025. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
February 19, 2025 Filing 4 FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (cwc)
February 19, 2025 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to EDENS GARDEN ESSENTIALS CORPORATION. (cwc)
February 18, 2025 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Beth Bloom. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Marty Fulgueira Elfenbein is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (cwc)
February 18, 2025 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT FOR NON-INFRINGEMENT AS WELL AS CLAIMS FOR TRADEMARK CANCELLATION, TORTIOUS INTERFERENCE, BUSINESS DISPARAGEMENT, AND DEFAMATION against EDENS GARDEN ESSENTIALS CORPORATION. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-18213846, filed by GOJA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Pearce, Victoria)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GOJA, LLC v. EDENS GARDEN ESSENTIALS CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GOJA, LLC
Represented By: Victoria Marie Pearce McLaughlin
Represented By: Stewart Mesher
Represented By: Darlene F. Ghavimi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EDENS GARDEN ESSENTIALS CORPORATION
Represented By: Matthew Scott Nelles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?