Godur v. Berish
Plaintiff: Ms. Sara Godur
Defendant: Jill Berish
Case Number: 1:2025cv20824
Filed: February 21, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Darrin P Gayles
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 18, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2025 Filing 11 MOTION to Remand to State Court Probate Division by Jill Berish. (Burgos, Joselito)
April 11, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PAPERLESS ORDER REQUIRING JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT AND PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER. Pursuant to S.D. Fla. Local Rule 16.1, on or before April 30, 2025, the parties shall prepare and file a Joint Scheduling Report, as well as Certificates of Interested Parties and Corporate Disclosure Statements.The parties shall also file a Proposed Scheduling Order, adhering to the format and guidance of the attached form. If the parties deviate in any way from that format and guidance, they shall contemporaneously submit a written explanation, which provides their purported justification for each and every deviation. If the parties fail to submit such written explanation, the Court may enter a Scheduling Order that does not take into account the parties' proposed dates.Failure to comply with this Order shall be grounds for dismissal without prejudice and without further notice. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 4/11/2025. (mp02)
April 11, 2025 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE - Attorney Admissions has updated the address information as submitted through attorneys PACER account for attorney Joselito Burgos re #8 Notice of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name (pt)
April 11, 2025 Filing 8 NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information; Change of Email; Change of Law Firm Name; by Joselito Burgos (Burgos, Joselito)
April 11, 2025 Filing 7 Defendant's RESPONSE Motion to Dismiss by Jill Berish. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order Appointing Guardian, #2 Exhibit Letters of Guardian)(Burgos, Joselito)
April 8, 2025 Filing 6 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #5 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Sara Godur. Jill Berish served on 3/29/2025, response/answer due 4/21/2025. (Barket, Dylan)
March 17, 2025 Filing 5 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Jill Berish, filed by Sara Godur. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Complaint - Warranty Deed, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Complaint - Durable Power of Attorney of Sara Godur and Philip Godur, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C to Complaint - Quit Claim Deed to Jill Berish, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D to Complaint - Department of Children and Families HIPAA and R&R Receipt, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E to Complaint - Revocation of Power of Attorney)(Barket, Dylan)
February 25, 2025 Filing 4 NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE. Unless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion shall be double-spaced in Times New Roman 12-point typeface. Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions. Failure to comply with ANY of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions, including but not limited to, the striking of the motion or dismissal of this action. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 2/25/2025. (mp02)
February 24, 2025 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Jill Berish. (jas)
February 21, 2025 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Darrin P. Gayles. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (jas)
February 21, 2025 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jill Berish. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-18225789, filed by Sara Godur. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Complaint - Warranty Deed, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Complaint - Durable Power of Attorney of Sara Godur and Philip Godur, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C to Complaint - Quit Claim Deed to Jill Berish, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D to Complaint - Department of Children and Families HIPAA and R&R Receipt, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E to Complaint - Revocation of Power of Attorney, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Summons for Jill Berish)(Barket, Dylan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Godur v. Berish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ms. Sara Godur
Represented By: Guy Gersten Spiegelman
Represented By: Dylan George Barket
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jill Berish
Represented By: Joselito Burgos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?