Stokes v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Krystal Stokes
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2025cv20865
Filed: February 25, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Ryon M McCabe
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 0405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 4, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 4, 2025 Filing 9 FINAL JUDGMENT in favor of Krystal Stokes against Commissioner of Social Security Closing Case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ryon M. McCabe on 4/4/2025. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
April 4, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING UNOPPOSED MOTION TO REMAND granting #7 Motion to Remand. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ryon M. McCabe on 4/4/2025. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
April 3, 2025 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION to Remand to Social Security Adminstration by Commissioner of Social Security. (Truong, Long)
April 1, 2025 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Long X. Truong on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security. Attorney Long X. Truong added to party Commissioner of Social Security(pty:dft). (Truong, Long)
February 25, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER SETTING SOCIAL SECURITY CASE PROCEDURES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ryon M. McCabe on 2/25/2025. See attached document for full details. (wce)
February 25, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. USM Service NOT Ordered. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ryon M. McCabe on 2/25/2025. (jb02)
February 25, 2025 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Krystal Stokes. (wce)
February 25, 2025 Filing 2 Judge Assignment to Magistrate Judge Ryon M. McCabe. (wce)
February 25, 2025 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Leland Dudek. Filing fees $ 405.00. IFP Filed, filed by Krystal Stokes. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Application to Proceed IFP)Case restricted pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2. (Atkins, Sarah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stokes v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Krystal Stokes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Noticing Social Security US Attorney
Represented By: Noticing Social Security General Counsel of SSA
Represented By: Long X. Truong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?