Copeland v. Secretary, Department of Corrections et al

Plaintiff: Shannon Copeland
Respondent: Secretary Department of Corrections and Florida Attorney General
Case Number: 2:2018cv14086
Filed: March 9, 2018
Court: Florida Southern District Court
Office: Ft Pierce Office
County: XX US, Outside State
0 Judge: Robin L Rosenberg
1 Judge: Patrick A White
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 9, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
March 9, 2018 5 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg and Magistrate Judge Patrick A. White. Pursuant to Administrative Order 2003-19, this matter is referred to the Magistrate Judge for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters. (jua)
March 9, 2018 4 Case transferred in from Florida Middle; Case Number 5:18-cv-00084. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(jua).
March 8, 2018 3 TRANSFER to the District of Southern Florida. (LMF)
March 7, 2018 2 Featured Case ORDER TRANSFERRING case to the Southern District of Florida. Signed by Senior Judge Wm. Terrell Hodges on 3/7/2018. (CLF)
February 14, 2018 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus -State filed by Shannon Copeland. (No fees paid; No service copies provided)(MLS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Copeland v. Secretary, Department of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Secretary Department of Corrections
Represented By: Noticing 2254 SAG Broward and North
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Florida Attorney General
Represented By: Noticing 2254 SAG Broward and North
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?