Broadspectrum Infrastructure, Inc. v. Gore Marine Transportation

Plaintiff: Broadspectrum Infrastructure, Inc.
Defendant: Gore Marine Transportation
Case Number: 2:2018cv14276
Filed: July 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Office: Ft Pierce Office
County: St. Lucie (Office: Ft Pierce)
Presiding Judge: Jose E Martinez
Referring Judge: Shaniek M Maynard
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Setting Discovery Procedures. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard on 8/29/2018. See attached document for full details. (ls)
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER: ( Jury Trial set for 6/24/2019 09:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Jose E. Martinez., Calendar Call set for 6/20/2019 01:30 PM in Miami Division before Judge Jose E. Martinez.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation., ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 8/29/2018. See attached document for full details. (ls) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
August 22, 2018 Filing 12 Certificate of Interested Parties/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Broadspectrum Infrastructure, Inc. (Harvey, Edward)
August 21, 2018 Filing 11 Certificate of Interested Parties/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Gore Marine Transportation (Webb, Trisha)
August 21, 2018 Filing 10 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Gore Marine Transportation (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Webb, Trisha)
August 15, 2018 Filing 9 STATUS REPORT ON REMOVAL by Gore Marine Transportation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Webb, Trisha)
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney(s) Robert C. Evans. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 8/13/2018. See attached document for full details. (ls)
August 10, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Robert C. Evans. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-10897071 by Gore Marine Transportation. Responses due by 8/24/2018 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Webb, Trisha)
August 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PAPERLESS ORDER granting in part and denying in part #5 Defendant's Joint Motion for Expansion of Time for Response to Order Requiring Parties to Meet and File Joint Scheduling Report and Proposed Order and Directing Parties to File Certificates of Interested Parties. The parties will be permitted to meet telephonically for the joint scheduling conference in light of the circumstances. The Joint Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties must be submitted on or before August 21, 2018. This order shall affect no other deadlines. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 8/6/2018. (jza)
August 6, 2018 Filing 5 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time FOR RESPONSE TO ORDER REQUIRING PARTIES TO MEET AND FILE JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT AND PROPOSED ORDER AND DIRECTING PARTIES TO FILE CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Gore Marine Transportation. Responses due by 8/20/2018 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Webb, Trisha)
July 17, 2018 Filing 4 Notice of Court Practice in Removal Cases. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 7/17/2018. See attached document for full details. (dq)
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 7/17/2018. See attached document for full details. (dq)
July 14, 2018 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Jose E. Martinez and Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (cbr)
July 14, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Broadspectrum Infrastructure v. Gore Marine Transportation) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-10818034, filed by Gore Marine Transportation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Defendant's, #2 Exhibit Defendant's, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Webb, Trisha)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Broadspectrum Infrastructure, Inc. v. Gore Marine Transportation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Broadspectrum Infrastructure, Inc.
Represented By: Edward M. Harvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gore Marine Transportation
Represented By: Trisha Toller Webb
Represented By: Robert C. Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?