Oyola v. McCray et al
Plaintiff: Miguel Oyola
Defendant: William Crouch, John Stroer, Reginaid McCray and John Smith
Case Number: 2:2018cv14298
Filed: July 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Office: Ft Pierce Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Jose E Martinez
Referring Judge: Patrick A White
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PAPERLESS ORDER granting in part and denying in part #11 Motion for Clarification; denying #11 Motion for Sanctions. A defendant Reginald McCray has filed a motion requesting clarification and imposition of sanction against the plaintiff. McCray alleges that the plaintiff has served him with a report and recommendation that has been altered from the original report issued by the undersigned. To the extent the defendant seeks an order clarifying that the document he has submitted has material alterations from the original that motion is granted. Since the document has not been filed by the plaintiff with this court no sanctions will be imposed, however McCray may seek other remedies through the appropriate authorities. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick A. White on 9/14/2018. (jbr)
September 11, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION for Clarification #10 Report and Recommendations, MOTION for Sanctions by Reginaid McCray. (Responses due by 9/25/2018). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(mc)
August 7, 2018 Filing 10 PRELIMINARY REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS on 42 USC 1983 case re #1 Complaint filed by Miguel Oyola; Recommending the court concludes that Plaintiff would have little or no chance of success on the claims as set forth in this proceeding. Accordingly, the court recommends that the complaint be dismissed under 1915(e) for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted, and that the case be closed. Objections to R&R due by 8/21/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick A. White on 8/7/2018. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER PERMITTING PLAINTIFF TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FILING FEE BUT ESTABLISHING DEBT TO CLERK OF $350.00 granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Granting to the extent that the plaintiff need not prepay even a partial filing fee in this case, or to prepay costs such as for service of process. USM Service NOT Ordered. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick A. White on 8/1/2018. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE CIVIL RIGHTS LITIGANTS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick A. White on 8/1/2018. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
July 31, 2018 Filing 7 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Jose E. Martinez and Magistrate Judge Patrick A. White. Pursuant to Administrative Order 2003-19, this matter is referred to the Magistrate Judge for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters. (jua)
July 31, 2018 Filing 6 Case transferred in from Florida Middle; Case Number 6:18-cv-01207. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(jua).
July 31, 2018 Filing 5 TRANSFER to the Southern District of Florida, Fort Pierce Division (EJS)
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER. This case shall be transferred to the United States District Court, Southern District of Florida, Fort Pierce Division. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 7/31/2018. (EJS)
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. The Notice of Pendency of Other Actions shall be filed within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 7/31/2018. (GNB) copies mailed
July 26, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Miguel Oyola. (DMA) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith.
July 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against William Crouch, Reginaid McCray, John Smith, John Stroer filed by Miguel Oyola.(DMA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oyola v. McCray et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miguel Oyola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Crouch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Stroer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reginaid McCray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?