Corbin v. Warden Bryner et al
Plaintiff: Kenneth Corbin
Defendant: Warden Bryner, T. Patten, Assistant Warden Snyder and Florida State Prison Medical Staff
Case Number: 2:2018cv14345
Filed: August 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Jose E Martinez
Referring Judge: Patrick A White
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2018 Filing 10 PRELIMINARY REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS on 42 USC 1983 case re #1 Complaint filed by Kenneth Corbin; Recommending that the complaint should be dismissed for failure to state a claim pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii). It is further recommended that Final Judgment be entered, and this case be CLOSED. Objections to R&R due by 10/15/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick A. White on 10/1/2018. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff to Proceed without Prepayment of Filing Fee but Establishing Debt to Clerk of $350.00. Granting to the extent that the plaintiff need not prepay even a partial filing fee in this case, or to prepay costs such as for service of process. USM Service NOT Ordered. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick A. White on 9/17/2018. See attached document for full details. (lr)
September 17, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Kenneth Corbin. (pes)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REQUIRING PAYMENT OF FILING FEE OR FILING OF MOTION TO PROCEED IFP WITH DETAILED AFFIDAVIT. Filing Fee due by 9/14/2018. Motions due by 9/14/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick A. White on 8/28/2018. See attached document for full details. (Attachments: #1 IFP Form) (fbn)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE CIVIL RIGHTS LITIGANTS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick A. White on 8/28/2018. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
August 27, 2018 Filing 5 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Jose E. Martinez and Magistrate Judge Patrick A. White. Pursuant to Administrative Order 2003-19, this matter is referred to the Magistrate Judge for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters. (bb)
August 27, 2018 Filing 4 Case transferred in from Florida Middle; Case Number 8:18-cv-02120. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(bb).
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER finding that the proper venue is the USDC for the Southern District of Florida; transferring the case to the SDFL, Ft. Pierce Division; directing the clerk to CLOSE the case. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 8/24/2018. (BK)
August 24, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for temporary restraining order by Kenneth Corbin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Mailing Envelope)(DG)
August 24, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Assistant Warden Snyder, Florida State Prison Medical Staff, T. Patten, Warden Bryner filed by Kenneth Corbin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Mailing Envelope)(DG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Corbin v. Warden Bryner et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Bryner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Patten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Assistant Warden Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Florida State Prison Medical Staff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Corbin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?