U. S. Bank National Association v. Krondes et al
Plaintiff: U. S. Bank National Association
Defendant: Karen A. Krondes and John Krondes
Case Number: 2:2018cv14390
Filed: September 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Shaniek M Maynard
Referring Judge: Donald M Middlebrooks
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2018 Filing 29 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT as to #25 Order on Motion to Remand to State Court,,, Acknowledgment filed by U. S. Bank National Association (lk)
November 2, 2018 Filing 28 AFFIDAVIT signed by : Karen Krondes Blair. by Karen A. Krondes (lk)
November 2, 2018 Filing 27 Notice of Joinder by Karen A. Krondes Related document: #24 MOTION to Vacate 17 Order,,,,, MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer filed by John Krondes, Karen A. Krondes, #23 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer filed by John Krondes (lk)
November 2, 2018 Filing 26 Transmittal Letter Sent with Certified copy of Order to: 19th Judicial Circuit Court in and for Saint Lucie County, FL. State Court Case Number: 2017CA001117 (lk)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Remand to State Court-19th Judicial Circuit in and for Saint Lucie County, FL; Denying #23 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer ; Denying #24 Motion to Vacate ; denying #24 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer. Closing Case. Motions Terminated: #12 Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by U. S. Bank National Association, #24 MOTION to Vacate 17 Order,,,, Set/Reset Motion/R&R Deadlines and Hearings,,, MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer filed by John Krondes, Karen A. Krondes, #23 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer filed by John Krondes. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 11/1/2018. See attached document for full details. (lk)
October 30, 2018 Filing 24 MOTION to Vacate and or Modify response time re 17 Order to show cause, ( Responses due by 11/13/2018), and MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer to the plaintiff's motion for remand by John Krondes, Karen A. Krondes. (lk)
October 30, 2018 Filing 23 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's motion for remand by John Krondes. (lk)
October 30, 2018 Filing 22 AFFIDAVIT of John J. Krondes-(Statement of Facts concerning Lack of Service and Receipt of Motion for Remand) by John Krondes (lk)
October 30, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE of Motion (Motion to Vacate and Modify Order on Time to respond to Plaintiff's motion for Remand and Order to Show cause) by John Krondes (lk)
October 30, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE OF MOTION (MOTION for extension of time to respond) by John Krondes (lk)
October 26, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE OF FILING EXHIBITS relevant to the Removal from the 19th Judicial Circuit Court of St. Lucie County, Florida by John Krondes (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F) (lk)
October 26, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE of CONSENT of Defendant The Princess Condominium of Hutchinson Island to Removal by John Krondes (lk)
October 23, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings as per DE 17 : Show Cause Response due by 10/26/2018. (lk)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 PAPERLESS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE why #12 Plaintiff U.S. Bank National Association's Motion to Remand to State Court should not be granted by default. The motion (DE #12 ) was filed on October 5, 2018. Local Rule 7.1(c) requires that a party opposing a motion "serve an opposing memorandum of law no later than (14) days after service of the motion. Failure to do so may be deemed sufficient cause for granting the motion by default." To date, Defendants John Krondes and Karen Krondes have not filed an opposing memorandum of law. Accordingly, it is ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that Defendants John and Karen Krondes shall have until October 26, 2018 to SHOW CAUSE why the Plaintiff's Motion to Remand should not be granted by default. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 10/23/2018. (kal)
October 9, 2018 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT and Statement of Facts signed by : Karen Krondes Blair. by Karen A. Krondes (lk)
October 9, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of consent to the removal of 19th Judicial Circuit State Case #2017CA001117 by Karen A. Krondes (lk)
October 5, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Consent to the Removal of 19th Judicial Circuit State Case #2017CA001117 by Karen A. Krondes (lk)
October 5, 2018 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT signed by : KAREN KRONDES BLAIR. (Statement of facts concerning lack of service) by Karen A. Krondes (lk)
October 5, 2018 Filing 12 Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand to State Court by U. S. Bank National Association. Attorney H. Michael Muniz added to party U. S. Bank National Association(pty:pla). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Muniz, H.)
October 4, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of DEMAND for Trial by Jury by John Krondes (lk)
October 4, 2018 Filing 10 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by John Krondes (lk)
October 3, 2018 Filing 9 DEMAND for Jury Trial by Jury by John Krondes (lk)
October 3, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE OF DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL by John Krondes (lk)
October 1, 2018 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of John J. Krondes by John Krondes. (kpe)
September 24, 2018 Filing 6 SECOND NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Second Notice of Filing Notice of Removal) Filing fee $400.00, filed by John Krondes.(cqs)
September 21, 2018 Filing 5 Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Jennifer M. Scott, mailing date September 21, 2018, (pt)
September 21, 2018 Filing 4 Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Michael Dermody, mailing date September 21, 2018, (pt)
September 20, 2018 Filing 3 Clerks Notice of Receipt of Filing Fee received on 9/20/2018 in the amount of $ 400.00, receipt number FLS000010917 (cbr)
September 20, 2018 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks and Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (cbr)
September 20, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL against U. S. Bank National Association. Filing fees $ 400.00, filed by Karen A. Krondes, John Krondes. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents)(cbr)Text/Title Modified on 9/24/2018 (cqs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U. S. Bank National Association v. Krondes et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen A. Krondes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Krondes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U. S. Bank National Association
Represented By: Jennifer M. Scott
Represented By: H. Michael Muniz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?