Harris v. The School Board of St. Lucie County et al
Plaintiff: David Harris
Defendant: The School Board of St. Lucie County, Angela Patton and Natalie Williams
Case Number: 2:2018cv14451
Filed: November 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: William Matthewman
Referring Judge: Shaniek M Maynard
2 Judge: Robin L Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2018 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Angela Patton, The School Board of St. Lucie County, Natalie Williams filed in response to Order Granting Motion for Leave filed by David Harris.(cga)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. USM Service NOT Ordered. Second Amended Complaint due by 12/21/2018. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 12/7/2018. See attached document for full details. (ail)
November 20, 2018 Filing 8 AMENDED MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by David Harris. (cga)
November 20, 2018 Filing 7 **STRICKEN** AMENDED COMPLAINT against Angela Patton, The School Board of St. Lucie County, Natalie Williams filed in response to Order Granting Motion for Leave, filed by David Harris. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Incident Reports)(cga)Text Modified on 12/10/2018 per DE #9 ORDER (ail).
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PAPERLESS ORDER denying without prejudice Plaintiff's Motion to Appear in Forma Pauperis (IFP) [DE 3]. Plaintiff is ordered to explain to the Court in an amended IFP motion what income he has to support his three dependents. This includes income from Social Security or disability benefits. Furthermore, the Complaint [DE 1] is dismissed without prejudice. The Court finds that the Complaint as drafted does not allege the basis for subject matter jurisdiction as required by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 8(a)(1). Federal courts are courts of limited jurisdiction, and only have subject matter jurisdiction over cases involving a federal question or with diverse parties. Here, the parties are not diverse because the Plaintiff appears to be a citizen of Florida and the Defendant is also a citizen of Florida. Accordingly, to maintain his case in federal court, Plaintiff must bring a claim that arises under federal law. If Plaintiff wishes to pursue this case in federal court, he is ordered to file an amended complaint, including a statement of the Court's jurisdiction over the case, by no later than November 21, 2018. If Plaintiff fails to timely file an amended complaint, the Court will close this case. If Plaintiff wishes to proceed IFP, he must also file an amended IFP motion by no later than November 21, 2018. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 11/7/2018. (kbs)
November 5, 2018 Filing 5 Clerks Notice Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge William Matthewman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (vjk)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge William Matthewman for all further proceedings Motions referred to Judge William Matthewman. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard on 11/5/2018. See attached document for full details. (vjk)
November 2, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by David Harris. (cga)
November 2, 2018 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg and Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (cga)
November 2, 2018 Filing 1 Complaint pursuant to 42 USC 1983 against Angela Patton, The School Board of St. Lucie County, Natalie Williams. Filing fee $ 400.00 NOT PAID. IFP Motion filed by David Harris.(cga)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. The School Board of St. Lucie County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The School Board of St. Lucie County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angela Patton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Natalie Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?