Anderson et al v. Bank Of America, N.A.

Plaintiff: Michael D. Anderson and Steven H. Anderson
Defendant: Bank Of America, N.A.
Case Number: 2:2019cv14136
Filed: April 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Shaniek M Maynard
Referring Judge: Donald M Middlebrooks
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 PAPERLESS ORDER. The Parties have filed a Joint Notice of Settlement (DE #15 ), and the Court congratulates the Parties on their amicable resolution of this matter. The Parties are directed to submit appropriate dismissal documents on or before July 8, 2019. The Parties may move the Court to retain jurisdiction upon closing the case if necessary to enforce the terms of their settlement agreement. The Parties are further advised that until closing documents are filed, the Court will expect compliance with all deadlines presently set in this case. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 6/27/2019. (mbt)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PAPERLESS Order cancelling the telephonic Scheduling Conference that is currently set for 2:10 PM on Wednesday, June 26, 2019 in light of the parties' Joint Notice of Settlement (DE 15). Signed by Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard on 6/25/2019. (ip00)
June 25, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Settlement by Bank Of America, N.A. (Parrino, Marc)
June 21, 2019 Filing 14 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by Michael D. Anderson, Steven H. Anderson (Thibaut, Matthew)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PAPERLESS ORDER re-setting the telephonic Scheduling Conference to WEDNESDAY 6/26/2019 at 2:10 PM before Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard on 6/19/2019. (ip00)
June 14, 2019 Filing 12 REPLY to #11 Response in Opposition to Motion, by Bank Of America, N.A.. (Parrino, Marc)
June 7, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), filed by Michael D. Anderson, Steven H. Anderson. Replies due by 6/14/2019. (Pickett, Charles)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND ORDER REQUIRING JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT (Telephone Conference set for 6/27/2019 02:20 PM before Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard, Joint Scheduling Report due by 6/25/2019) Signed by Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard on 6/5/2019. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REFERRING CASE AND SETTING TRIAL DATE: (Jury Trial set for 2/3/2020 09:00 AM in Fort Pierce Division before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks., Calendar Call set for 1/29/2020 01:15 PM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard to conduct a scheduling conference. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 6/3/2019. See attached document for full details. (pcs) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #7 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for Plaintiffs to respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (DE #5 ) is extended to June 7, 2019. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 5/29/2019. (mbt)
May 28, 2019 Filing 7 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #5 MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), by Michael D. Anderson, Steven H. Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pickett, Charles)
May 28, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Charles Leroy Pickett, Jr on behalf of Michael D. Anderson, Steven H. Anderson. Attorney Charles Leroy Pickett, Jr added to party Michael D. Anderson(pty:pla), Attorney Charles Leroy Pickett, Jr added to party Steven H. Anderson(pty:pla). (Pickett, Charles)
May 15, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), by Bank Of America, N.A.. Responses due by 5/29/2019 (Parrino, Marc)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #3 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for Defendant to respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint (DE 1-2) is extended to May 15, 2019. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 5/1/2019. (mbt)
April 30, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), by Bank Of America, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Parrino, Marc)
April 24, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks and Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pcs)
April 24, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint for Damages and Demand for Jury Trial) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11584536, filed by Bank Of America, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit State Court Documents, #3 Exhibit State Court Notice of Filing Notice of Removal)(Parrino, Marc) No Answer / Motion to Dismiss filed. Text Modified on 4/24/2019 (pcs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson et al v. Bank Of America, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank Of America, N.A.
Represented By: Marc Thomas Parrino
Represented By: Sahily Serradet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael D. Anderson
Represented By: Matthew N. Thibaut
Represented By: Jason S. Haselkorn
Represented By: Charles Leroy Pickett, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven H. Anderson
Represented By: Matthew N. Thibaut
Represented By: Jason S. Haselkorn
Represented By: Charles Leroy Pickett, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?