Martin v. Quick SpA et al
Plaintiff: Roger Martin
Defendant: John Miller, The Talaria Company, LLC d/b/a The Hinckley Company, Quick USA, Inc., Quick SpA, The Talaria Company, LLC. and Quick USA
Case Number: 2:2019cv14153
Filed: May 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Jose E Martinez
Referring Judge: Shaniek M Maynard
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 NOTICE by Quick SpA re #30 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #25 Amended Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Quick USA's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint) (Wermuth, John)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 NOTICE of Striking #31 Supplemental MOTION to Dismiss #30 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #25 Amended Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Proposed Order filed by Quick SpA by Quick SpA (Wermuth, John)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Supplemental MOTION to Dismiss #30 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #25 Amended Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Proposed Order by Quick SpA. Responses due by 7/11/2019 (Wermuth, John)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #25 Amended Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Quick SpA. Responses due by 7/11/2019 (Wermuth, John)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint [D.E. 25] by The Talaria Company, LLC.. (Campellone, Jamey)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Granting #27 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Nicole M. Matteo. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 6/26/2019. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Nicole M. Matteo. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11747997 by The Talaria Company, LLC.. Responses due by 7/8/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Campellone, Jamey)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Granting #24 Amended Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Michael J. Daly. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 6/10/2019. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Plaintiff's AMENDED COMPLAINT against Quick SpA, The Talaria Company, LLC. filed in response to Order Granting Motion for Leave, filed by PR Overseas Boating Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Sutton, John)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Amended MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Michael J. Daly. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Amended/Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filed - Filing Fees Previously Paid. See #19 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, by The Talaria Company, LLC.. Responses due by 6/21/2019 (Attachments: #1 Certification of Michael J. Daly, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Campellone, Jamey)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Attorney Michael J. Daly representing The Talaria Company, LLC. (Defendant) Activated. (pt)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER denying #19 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Michael J. Daly. Notice of Termination delivered by US Mail to Michael Daly. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 6/6/2019. See attached document for full details. (ar2)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STATUS REPORT Pursuant to the Court's Notice of Court Practice in Removal Cases [D.E. 4] by The Talaria Company, LLC. (Campellone, Jamey)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Initial Disclosure(s) by Quick SpA (Wermuth, John)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard on 5/23/2019. See attached document for full details. (jas)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Michael J. Daly. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11670498 by The Talaria Company, LLC.. Responses due by 6/6/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certification of Michael J. Daly, Esq., #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Krimsky, Beth-Ann)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER APPROVING JOINT STIPULATION TO AMEND COMPLAINT re #16 Joint Stipulation, (Amended Complaint due by 6/10/2019). Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 5/22/2019. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER SETTING CIVIL TRIAL DATE AND PRETRIAL SCHEDULE. REOUIRING MEDIATION. AND REFERRING CERTAIN MOTIONS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: (Jury Trial set for 6/22/2020 09:30 AM in Fort Pierce Division before Judge Jose E. Martinez., Calendar Call set for 6/18/2020 01:30 PM in Miami Division before Judge Jose E. Martinez.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. ( Mediation Deadline 4/23/2020.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 5/21/2019. See attached document for full details. (ebz) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here. (ebz).
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION Regarding Amendment of Complaint by Roger Martin (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Approving Joint Stipulation)(Sutton, John)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Roger Martin (Sutton, John)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Quick SpA (Wermuth, John)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Talaria Company, LLC. identifying Other Affiliate Pierce Atwood LLP, Other Affiliate THC, Inc., Other Affiliate Talaria Holdings, LLC, Other Affiliate Michael J. Daly for The Talaria Company, LLC. (Campellone, Jamey)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Chris Leyden and PR Overseas Boating Ltd. (Sutton, John)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Clerks Notice to Filer re #10 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Parties Not Added; ERROR - The Filer failed to add all parties. Filer is instructed to file a Notice of Entry of Parties and add the additional parties. (jas)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Roger Martin (Sutton, John)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #8 Defendant Quick USA, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. Defendant Quick USA, Inc. shall respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint on or before May 24, 2019. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 5/8/2019. (ean)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer by Quick SpA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wermuth, John)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Michael Wermuth on behalf of Quick SpA. Attorney John Michael Wermuth added to party Quick SpA(pty:dft). (Wermuth, John)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #5 Defendant The Talaria Company, LLC's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. Defendant The Talaria Company, LLC shall respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint on or before May 24, 2019. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 5/7/2019. (ean)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by The Talaria Company, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Agreed Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time)(Campellone, Jamey)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Notice of Court Practice in Removal Cases. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 5/6/2019. See attached document for full details. (dq)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 5/6/2019. See attached document for full details. (dq)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Jose E. Martinez and Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ebz)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Amended Complaint) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11611043, filed by The Talaria Company, LLC d/b/a The Hinckley Company. No Motion to Dismiss and/or Answer has been attached. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Documents, #2 Exhibit Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Campellone, Jamey) Modified on 5/3/2019 (ebz).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martin v. Quick SpA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger Martin
Represented By: John Richardson Sutton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Miller
Represented By: Beth-Ann Ellenberg Krimsky
Represented By: Jamey Robert Campellone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Talaria Company, LLC d/b/a The Hinckley Company
Represented By: Jamey Robert Campellone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quick USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quick SpA
Represented By: John Michael Wermuth
Represented By: Beth-Ann Ellenberg Krimsky
Represented By: Jamey Robert Campellone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Talaria Company, LLC.
Represented By: Jamey Robert Campellone
Represented By: Beth-Ann Ellenberg Krimsky
Represented By: Nicole M. Matteo
Represented By: Michael J. Daly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quick USA
Represented By: John Michael Wermuth
Represented By: Beth-Ann Ellenberg Krimsky
Represented By: Jamey Robert Campellone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?