CASEY v. TRUMP et al

Defendant: DONALD TRUMP and United States Attorney General
Petitioner: BRIAN M. CASEY
Respondent: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 2:2019cv14178
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Jose E Martinez
Referring Judge: Lisette M Reid
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PAPERLESS ORDER dismissing amended complaint [ECF 9] without prejudice for the reasons set forth in ECF 10. If petitioner wishes to file a Section 1983 action, he must do so by filing a separate case under a new case number, along with the filing fee or a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 6/11/2019. (rm01)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PAPERLESS ORDER denying #8 Motion for Leave to File ; denying #8 Motion to Amend/Correct; denying as moot #8 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Petitioner initiated this Section 2241 action in the United States District Court for the District of Columbia. [ECF 1]. Thereafter, it appears that the District of Columbia Court granted Petitioner IFP status and transferred the action to the Southern District of Florida. [ECF 6]. Petitioner has now filed a civil rights complaint pursuant to 42 U.S.C. 1983, which he has labeled as his "amended" complaint in the instant action. [ECF 9] This case, however, pertains to petitioner's Section 2241 claim. If petitioner seeks to raise a Section 1983 claim, he must do so by filing a separate action with the Court along with a detailed motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. This Court notes that petitioner has previously been deemed a "three-striker" by the United States District Court for the Northern District of Florida. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 6/11/2019. (rm01)
June 4, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, United States Attorney General, filed by BRIAN M. CASEY.(vmz)
June 4, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint With Waiver of Filing Fees as to DE #1 Complaint ( Responses due by 6/18/2019) by BRIAN M. CASEY. (vmz). Added MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis on 6/6/2019 (vmz).
May 20, 2019 Filing 7 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Jose E. Martinez and Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid. Pursuant to Administrative Order 2019-2, this matter is referred to the Magistrate Judge for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters. (jua)
May 20, 2019 Filing 6 Case transferred in from District of Columbia; Case Number 1:19-cv-00644. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(jua).
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TRANSFERRING PRO SE CASE to the USDC for the Southern District of Florida. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Transfer due by 5/16/2019. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 04/25/2019. (zsb)
April 19, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Inquiry by BRIAN M. CASEY (zsb)
April 19, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Change of Address by BRIAN M. CASEY (zsb)
March 5, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by BRIAN M. CASEY (zmd)
March 5, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS against DONALD TRUMP, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA with Jury Demand filed by BRIAN M. CASEY. (zmd)
March 5, 2019 Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 3/5/2019. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zmd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CASEY v. TRUMP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Noticing 2241/Bivens US Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: BRIAN M. CASEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DONALD TRUMP
Represented By: Noticing 2241/Bivens US Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?