Luna v. Department of Corrections
Plaintiff: Aron Luna
Defendant: Department of Corrections
Case Number: 2:2019cv14182
Filed: May 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Shaniek M Maynard
Referring Judge: Robin L Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melanie Dale Surber on behalf of Department of Corrections. Attorney Melanie Dale Surber added to party Department of Corrections(pty:dft). (Surber, Melanie)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 8/2/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard on 5/29/2019. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF REFERENCE to Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard for all non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation for any dispositive issues. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 5/28/2019. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
May 28, 2019 Filing 3 APPENDIX by Aron Luna (Attachments: #1 Transcripts, #2 Transcripts, #3 Transcripts, #4 Transcripts, #5 Transcripts, #6 Transcripts, #7 Transcripts, #8 Transcripts, #9 Transcripts, #10 Transcripts, #11 Transcripts, #12 Transcripts, #13 Transcripts, #14 Transcripts, #15 Transcripts)(Kessler, Michael)
May 24, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg and Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard. (kpe)
May 24, 2019 Filing 1 First APPLICATION/PETITION (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2254 . Filing fee $ 5.00 receipt number 113C-11675573, filed by Aron Luna. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kessler, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Luna v. Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aron Luna
Represented By: Michael Jeffrey Kessler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Corrections
Represented By: Noticing 2254 SAG Broward and North
Represented By: Melanie Dale Surber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?