Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. BRADY LYONS, INC. et al
Plaintiff: Broadcast Music, Inc., SONY/ATV SONGS LLC dba SONY/ATV TREE PUBLISHING, Carnival Music Company, UNIVERSAL SONGS OF POLYGRAM INTERNATIONAL INC., NASHVILLE STAR MUSIC, DON KIRSHNER ENTERTAINMENT COMPANY, ESCATAWPA SONGS, LLC, Songs of Universal, Inc., CRUVEN, INC. and SONY/ATV SONGS LLC
Defendant: DONEEN SNOOK, BRADY LYONS, INC., MATTHEW DOYLE and DENEEN SNOOK
Case Number: 2:2019cv14201
Filed: June 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Jose E Martinez
Referring Judge: Shaniek M Maynard
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:0101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of NO Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by Broadcast Music, Inc., CRUVEN, INC., Carnival Music Company, DON KIRSHNER ENTERTAINMENT COMPANY, ESCATAWPA SONGS, LLC, NASHVILLE STAR MUSIC, SONY/ATV SONGS LLC, Songs of Universal, Inc., UNIVERSAL SONGS OF POLYGRAM INTERNATIONAL INC. (Messa, Zachary)
August 9, 2019 Filing 6 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Broadcast Music, Inc., CRUVEN, INC., Carnival Music Company, DON KIRSHNER ENTERTAINMENT COMPANY, ESCATAWPA SONGS, LLC, NASHVILLE STAR MUSIC, SONY/ATV SONGS LLC, Songs of Universal, Inc., UNIVERSAL SONGS OF POLYGRAM INTERNATIONAL INC. identifying Corporate Parent Vivendi SA for Songs of Universal, Inc., UNIVERSAL SONGS OF POLYGRAM INTERNATIONAL INC.; Corporate Parent Sony Music Entertainment, Inc. for SONY/ATV SONGS LLC ; Corporate Parent CBS Broadcasting Inc. for DON KIRSHNER ENTERTAINMENT COMPANY; Corporate Parent TEGNA, Inc. for Broadcast Music, Inc. (Messa, Zachary)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 6/17/2019. See attached document for full details. (dq)
June 13, 2019 Filing 4 FORM AO 121 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. COPYRIGHT OFFICE (via US Mail) (amb)
June 13, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to BRADY LYONS, INC., MATTHEW DOYLE, DENEEN SNOOK. (amb)
June 12, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Jose E. Martinez and Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (amb)
June 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11725784, filed by ESCATAWPA SONGS, LLC, CRUVEN, INC., SONY/ATV SONGS LLC dba SONY/ATV TREE PUBLISHING, Carnival Music Company, DON KIRSHNER ENTERTAINMENT COMPANY, NASHVILLE STAR MUSIC, Broadcast Music, Inc., UNIVERSAL SONGS OF POLYGRAM INTERNATIONAL INC., Songs of Universal, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Song Schedule, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summon(s) Summons Brady Lyons, #4 Summon(s) Summons Matthew Doyle, #5 Summon(s) Summons Dineen Snook)(Messa, Zachary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. BRADY LYONS, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Broadcast Music, Inc.
Represented By: Zachary D. Messa
Represented By: Frank Robert Jakes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SONY/ATV SONGS LLC dba SONY/ATV TREE PUBLISHING
Represented By: Zachary D. Messa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carnival Music Company
Represented By: Zachary D. Messa
Represented By: Frank Robert Jakes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNIVERSAL SONGS OF POLYGRAM INTERNATIONAL INC.
Represented By: Zachary D. Messa
Represented By: Frank Robert Jakes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NASHVILLE STAR MUSIC
Represented By: Zachary D. Messa
Represented By: Frank Robert Jakes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DON KIRSHNER ENTERTAINMENT COMPANY
Represented By: Zachary D. Messa
Represented By: Frank Robert Jakes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ESCATAWPA SONGS, LLC
Represented By: Zachary D. Messa
Represented By: Frank Robert Jakes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Songs of Universal, Inc.
Represented By: Zachary D. Messa
Represented By: Frank Robert Jakes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CRUVEN, INC.
Represented By: Zachary D. Messa
Represented By: Frank Robert Jakes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SONY/ATV SONGS LLC
Represented By: Zachary D. Messa
Represented By: Frank Robert Jakes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DONEEN SNOOK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRADY LYONS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MATTHEW DOYLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DENEEN SNOOK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?