Center for Biological Diversity v. U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service
Plaintiff: Center for Biological Diversity
Defendant: U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service
Case Number: 2:2019cv14243
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Shaniek M Maynard
Referring Judge: Robin L Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:0552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REQUIRING STATUS REPORT Status Report due by 12/6/2019. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 9/3/2019. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
August 30, 2019 Filing 11 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Center for Biological Diversity (Bennett, Elise)
August 20, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service. Attorney Carlos Javier Raurell added to party U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service(pty:dft). (Raurell, Carlos)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY PROCEDURES Signed by Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard on 8/7/2019. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE, CALENDAR CALL, AND TRIAL DATE, ORDER OFREQUIREMENTS, AND ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. (Jury Trial set for 8/31/2020 09:00 AM in Fort Pierce Division before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg., Calendar Call set for 8/26/2020 09:00 AM before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg., Status Conference set for 6/17/2020 09:30 AM before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard for appropriate disposition of all pro hac vice motions, motions to substitute counsel and pretrial motions to discovery. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 8/6/2019. See attached document for full details. (ebz) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
August 1, 2019 Filing 7 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE filed by Center for Biological Diversity. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service, #2 Exhibit to Affidavit of Service)(Bennett, Elise)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER ON MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE, CONSENT TO DESIGNATION, AND REOUEST TO ELECTRONICALLY RECEIVE NOTICES OF ELECTRONIC FILING GRANTING re #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney(s) Brian Segee. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard on 7/18/2019. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
July 17, 2019 Filing 5 Plaintiff's MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Brian Segee. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11822219 by Center for Biological Diversity. Responses due by 7/31/2019 (Attachments: #1 Certification for Special Admission of Brian Segee)(Bennett, Elise)
July 17, 2019 Filing 4 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Center for Biological Diversity (Bennett, Elise)
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Summon(s), #2 Summon(s))(ebz)
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg and Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (ebz)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11811221, filed by Center for Biological Diversity. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s) U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service, #3 Summon(s) Attorney General Barr, #4 Summon(s) U.S. Attorney Fajardo Orshan)(Bennett, Elise)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Center for Biological Diversity v. U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service
Represented By: Carlos Javier Raurell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center for Biological Diversity
Represented By: Elise Pautler Bennett
Represented By: Jaclyn M Lopez
Represented By: Brian Segee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?