Poschmann v. Metropole Hotel Apartments, LLC
Plaintiff: David Poschmann
Defendant: Metropole Hotel Apartments, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv14283
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Shaniek M Maynard
Referring Judge: Robin L Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12182
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER CLOSING CASE. All pending motions are DENIED AS MOOT and all deadlines are terminated. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 9/20/2019. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
September 18, 2019 Filing 13 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Joint)(With Prejudice) by David Poschmann (Sarkin, Lee)
September 18, 2019 Filing 12 FINAL MEDIATION REPORT by Daniel T. Feld. Disposition: Settled in full.(Niad Hannah, Cindy)
September 13, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Mediator Selection and Hearing. Added Daniel T Feld. Mediation Hearing set for 09/17/2019 @ 3:00 p.m.. (Niad Hannah, Cindy)
September 13, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Mediator Selection and Hearing. Added David Poschmann, Daniel T Feld. Mediation Hearing set for 9/17/2019 at 3:00 p.m.. (Sarkin, Lee)
September 4, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Counsel re #5 Order of Requirements RE Prior ADA Filings by Lee David Sarkin on behalf of David Poschmann (Sarkin, Lee)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Answer due 9/23/2019. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 9/3/2019. (kbs)
September 3, 2019 Filing 7 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint by Metropole Hotel Apartments, LLC. Attorney Joshua Michael Entin added to party Metropole Hotel Apartments, LLC(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Proposed Order)(Entin, Joshua)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE, CALENDAR CALL, PRETRIAL DEADLINES, AND TRIAL DATE, ORDER OF REQUIREMENTS, ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE, AND ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MEDIATION (Fact Discovery due by 12/9/2019., Expert Discovery due by 12/20/2019., Dispositive Motions due by 1/13/2020., Jury Trial set for 4/13/2020 09:00 AM in Fort Pierce Division before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg., Calendar Call set for 4/8/2020 09:00 AM before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg., Status Conference set for 2/26/2020 09:30 AM before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg.), Order of Court-Mandated Requirements in, ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. (Mediation Deadline 10/30/2019.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard for appropriate disposition of all pro hac vice motions,. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 8/29/2019. See attached document for full details. (ebz) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REQUIRING CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL REGARDING ANY PRIOR FILINGS UNDER THE AMERICANS WITH DISABILITIES ACT. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 8/29/2019. See attached document for full details. (cds)
August 20, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by David Poschmann. Metropole Hotel Apartments, LLC served on 8/19/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (Levitt, Drew)
August 13, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Metropole Hotel Apartments, LLC. (mc)
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg and Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (mc)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11895420, filed by David Poschmann. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Sarkin, Lee)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Poschmann v. Metropole Hotel Apartments, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropole Hotel Apartments, LLC
Represented By: Joshua Michael Entin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Poschmann
Represented By: Lee David Sarkin
Represented By: Drew M. Levitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?