Maib v. Baird et al
Plaintiff: George Maib
Defendant: Joe Baird, Richard Szpryka, Christopher Mora and Jason Brown
Case Number: 2:2019cv14289
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Shaniek M Maynard
Referring Judge: Robin L Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 18:0241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PAPERLESS ORDER denying 13 Motion for Leave to Amend the Complaint and Motion for Disqualification. This Court dismissed this case with prejudice for lack of standing prior to Plaintiff filing his untimely Response to the Motion to Dismiss #12 and the Motions. To the extent that Plaintiff seeks to amend his claims, he may do so by filing a Complaint under a new case number. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 9/26/2019. (sk01)
September 25, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to For Leave To Amend #1 Complaint ( Responses due by 10/9/2019), MOTION for Recusal of The County Attorney. (FOR IMAGE SEE DE#12) by George Maib. (cds)
September 25, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE TO re #10 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM WITH PREJUDICE AND INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW filed by George Maib. Replies due by 10/2/2019. (cds)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Granting #10 Motion to Dismiss Complaint and Closing Case. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 9/25/2019. See attached document for full details. (ar2)
September 4, 2019 Filing 10 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM WITH PREJUDICE AND INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Joe Baird, Jason Brown, Christopher Mora, Richard Szpryka. Responses due by 9/18/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Final Judgment)(Reingold, Dylan)
August 29, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Dylan Todd Reingold on behalf of Joe Baird, Jason Brown, Christopher Mora, Richard Szpryka. Attorney Dylan Todd Reingold added to party Joe Baird(pty:dft), Attorney Dylan Todd Reingold added to party Jason Brown(pty:dft), Attorney Dylan Todd Reingold added to party Christopher Mora(pty:dft), Attorney Dylan Todd Reingold added to party Richard Szpryka(pty:dft). (Reingold, Dylan)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY STATUS CONFERENCE AND ORDER REQUIRING JOINT DISCOVERY STATUS REPORT. (Final Discovery Status Conference set for 1/23/2020 3:00 PM in Fort Pierce Division before Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard), (Joint Discovery Status Report due by 1/17/2020). Signed by Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard on 8/27/2019. See attached document for full details. (ar2)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard on 8/27/2019. See attached document for full details. (cds)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE, CALENDAR CALL, PRETRIAL DEADLINES, ANDTRIAL DATE, ORDER OF REQUIREMENTS, ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE, AND ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MEDIATION: (Fact Discovery due by 2/7/2020., Expert Discovery due by 2/21/2020., Dispositive Motions due by 3/6/2020., Jury Trial set for 6/8/2020 09:00 AM in Fort Pierce Division before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg., Calendar Call set for 6/3/2020 09:00 AM before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg., Status Conference set for 5/6/2020 09:30 AM before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation., ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard For Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 8/27/2019. See attached document for full details. (cds) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE LITIGANT Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 8/19/2019. See attached document for full details. (cqs)
August 16, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Joe Baird, Jason Brown, Christopher Mora, Richard Szpryka. (pcs)
August 16, 2019 Filing 3 Clerks Notice of Receipt of Filing Fee received on 8/16/2019 in the amount of $ 400.00, receipt number FLS900006503 (pcs)
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg and Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pcs)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT - PUBLIC CORRUPTION LAWSUIT against Joe Baird, Jason Brown, Christopher Mora, Richard Szpryka. Filing fees $ 400.00 Receipt#: FLS00006503, filed by George Maib. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(pcs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maib v. Baird et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Baird
Represented By: Dylan Todd Reingold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Szpryka
Represented By: Dylan Todd Reingold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Mora
Represented By: Dylan Todd Reingold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Brown
Represented By: Dylan Todd Reingold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Maib
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?