Wailes v. Penn Credit Corporation
Plaintiff: Beth Wailes
Defendant: Penn Credit Corporation
Case Number: 2:2019cv14417
Filed: November 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Shaniek M Maynard
Referring Judge: Robin L Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER CLOSING CASE. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 12/23/2019. See attached document for full details. (mee)
December 23, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal with prejudice by Beth Wailes (Patti, Thomas)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER ON NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT. Closing Case. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 12/12/2019. See attached document for full details. (mee)
December 12, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Settlement by Beth Wailes (Patti, Thomas)
December 5, 2019 Filing 6 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Beth Wailes (Patti, Thomas)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard on 11/15/2019. See attached document for full details. (mee)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE,CALENDAR CALL, AND TRIAL DATE, ORDER OF REQUIREMENTS, AND ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: ( Jury Trial set for 11/23/2020 at 09:00 AM in Fort Pierce Division before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg., Calendar Call set for 11/18/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg., Status Conference set for 10/21/2020 at 09:30 AM before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard for appropriate disposition of all pro hac vice motions, motions to substitute counsel, and pretrial motions related to discovery. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 11/14/2019. See attached document for full details. (mee)
November 7, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Penn Credit Corporation. (mee)
November 6, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg and Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (mee)
November 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-12127593, filed by Beth Wailes. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Exhibit)(Patti, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wailes v. Penn Credit Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beth Wailes
Represented By: Paul Aaron Herman
Represented By: Joel Adrian Brown
Represented By: Thomas John Patti, III
Represented By: Jibrael Jarallah Said Hindi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Penn Credit Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?