U.S. Bank National Association v. Krondes et al
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank National Association
Defendant: Karen A. Krondes and John Krondes
Case Number: 2:2019cv14470
Filed: December 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Shaniek M Maynard
Referring Judge: Robin L Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PAPERLESS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Defendants' response to #10 Plaintiffs Motion for Attorney's Fees was due on February 4, 2020. No response appears in the court file. Accordingly, Defendants shall show cause, in writing, why the Motion should not be granted by 5:00 PM on February 10, 2020. Defendants' failure to comply with this Order may result in the Court granting the Motion by default pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(c). Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 2/6/2020. (hhn)
January 21, 2020 Filing 10 Plaintiff's MOTION for Attorney Fees by U.S. Bank National Association. Responses due by 2/4/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Invoice)(McIver, Richard)
January 13, 2020 Filing 9 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT as to #8 Transmittal Letter Sent with Certified copy of Order of remand to: 19th Judicial Circuit Court in and for St. Lucie County. (ar2)
December 30, 2019 Filing 8 Transmittal Letter Sent with Certified copy of Order of remand to: 19th Judicial Circuit Court in and for St. Lucie County. State Court Case Number: 2017CA001117 (lk)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Remanding Case to State Court -19thJudicial County Court in and for St. Lucie County FL. Closing Case and terminating all deadlines and Denying all pending motions as moot. Motions terminated: #5 Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by U.S. Bank National Association. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 12/27/2019. See attached document for full details. (lk)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PAPERLESS ORDER REQUIRING EXPEDITED RESPONSE. Defendants shall respond to #5 Plaintiff's Motion to Remand by 12:00 PM on 12/20/2019. Such response shall explain why the Court should not remand the case on the grounds that (1) removal is untimely, (2) no federal question appears in Plaintiff's Complaint, (3) Defendant Princess Condominium of Hutchinson Island, Inc. is a citizen of Florida, and (4) Judge Middlebrooks previously remanded this case on 11/2/2018 at docket entry 25 in Case No. 2:18-cv-14390. Defendants shall also state why Plaintiff should not recover reasonable attorney's fees and costs incurred in connection with removal. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 12/13/2019. (hhn)
December 13, 2019 Set/Reset Deadline as to #5 Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand to State Court . Responses due by 12/20/2019. SEE DE 6 ORDER (ail)
December 11, 2019 Filing 5 Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand to State Court by U.S. Bank National Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Foreclosure Complaint)(McIver, Richard)
December 11, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Richard Slaughter McIver on behalf of U.S. Bank National Association. Attorney Richard Slaughter McIver added to party U.S. Bank National Association(pty:pla). (McIver, Richard)
December 9, 2019 Filing 3 Clerks Notice of Receipt of Filing Fee received on 12/9/2019 in the amount of $ 400.00, receipt number FLS000012532 (ls)
December 9, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg and Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ls)
December 9, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - 19th Judicial Circuit Court in and for St. Lucie County, FL) Filing fee $400.00 Receipt#: FLS000012532, filed by Karen A. Krondes, John Krondes. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ls)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Bank National Association v. Krondes et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen A. Krondes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Krondes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank National Association
Represented By: James M. Shuler
Represented By: Richard Slaughter McIver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?