GEICO General Insurance Company v. K&C Transportation Logistics Corp
Plaintiff: Geico Indemnity Company and GEICO General Insurance Company
Defendant: Yuricey Hernandez, K&C Transportation Logistics Corp, Margaret Lindsey Gardiner Freeman, Rafael L. Lobaina and Rafael Lobaina
Case Number: 2:2019cv14478
Filed: December 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Kenneth A Marra
Referring Judge: Shaniek M Maynard
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. All pending motions are denied as moot. This case is CLOSED. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 2/7/2020. See attached document for full details. (ir)
February 7, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice by GEICO General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Company (Adams, Laurie)
February 1, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by GEICO General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Company. Yuricey Hernandez served on 1/27/2020, answer due 2/18/2020. (Adams, Laurie)
February 1, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by GEICO General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Company. (Adams, Laurie)
February 1, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by GEICO General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Company. Rafael Lobaina served on 1/27/2020, answer due 2/18/2020. (Adams, Laurie)
February 1, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by GEICO General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Company. K&C Transportation Logistics Corp served on 1/27/2020, answer due 2/18/2020. (Adams, Laurie)
February 1, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by GEICO General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Company. Margaret Lindsey Gardiner Freeman served on 1/10/2020, answer due 1/31/2020. (Adams, Laurie)
January 2, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Margaret Lindsey Gardiner Freeman, Yuricey Hernandez, K&C Transportation Logistics Corp, Rafael Lobaina, Rafael L. Lobaina. (lbc)
December 30, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by GEICO General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Company re #1 Complaint, filed by GEICO General Insurance Company, Geico Indemnity Company (Attachments: #1 Summon(s) Margaret Lindsey Gardiner Freeman, #2 Summon(s) Rafael Lobaina, Sr., #3 Summon(s) K&C Transportation Logistics Corp., #4 Summon(s) Rafael Lobaina, Jr., #5 Summon(s) Yuricey Hernandez) (Adams, Laurie)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Requiring Counsel to Confer and File Joint Scheduling Report. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 12/18/2019. See attached document for full details. (ir)
December 18, 2019 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Party(ies) Improperly Formatted. The Filer failed to enter the party name(s) in accordance with the CM/ECF Format for Adding Parties for Attorneys Guide. The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file the document. (pcs)
December 18, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Kenneth A. Marra and Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pcs)
December 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against Yuricey Hernandez, Rafael Lobaina, Margaret Lindsey Gardiner Freeman. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-12238175, filed by Geico General Insurance Company, a foreign profit corporation, Geico Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Hernandez Policy, #2 Exhibit B: Lobaina, Sr. Policy, #3 Exhibit C: Amended Complaint in Underlying Lawsuit, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Adams, Laurie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GEICO General Insurance Company v. K&C Transportation Logistics Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yuricey Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K&C Transportation Logistics Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margaret Lindsey Gardiner Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rafael L. Lobaina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rafael Lobaina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geico Indemnity Company
Represented By: Laurie Jeanne Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEICO General Insurance Company
Represented By: Laurie Jeanne Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?