U.S. Bank National Association v. Krondes
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank National Association
Defendant: John Krondes
Case Number: 2:2020cv14239
Filed: July 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Shaniek M Maynard
Referring Judge: Donald M Middlebrooks
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2020 Filing 14 Memorandum in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court and for Sanctions filed by John Krondes. (not signed) Replies due by 9/18/2020. (cqs)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Granting in Part #11 Motion for Reconsideration ; Granting in Part #11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion ( Responses due by 9/11/2020). Re: #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court and for Sanctions filed by U.S. Bank National Association. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 8/27/2020. See attached document for full details. (cds)
August 11, 2020 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT (Statement of Facts Concerning Lack of Service) signed by: John J. Krondes re #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court and for Sanctions by John Krondes (cds)
August 11, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Modification re 10 Paperless Order, and Request for Extension of Time to File Response re #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court and for Sanctions by John Krondes. (cds)
August 7, 2020 Reset Deadlines Per DE#10. Responses due by 8/12/2020 (cqs)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PAPERLESS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. On July 22, 2020, Plaintiff filed a Motion to Remand. (DE #6 ). The deadline to respond has since passed, and Defendant has failed to file a response. Accordingly, Defendant shall respond to Plaintiff's Motion on or before August 12, 2020. Failure to timely comply with this order will result in Plaintiff's Motion being decided without a respond. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 8/7/2020. (gts)
August 4, 2020 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM of Law in Support of re #8 Jury Demand by John Krondes. (cds)
July 23, 2020 Filing 8 DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL by John Krondes (cds)
July 23, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Exacerbated Covid-19 Crisis in Florida by John Krondes (cds)
July 22, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Remand to State Court and for Sanctions by U.S. Bank National Association. (McIver, Richard)
July 22, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Richard Slaughter McIver on behalf of U.S. Bank National Association. Attorney Richard Slaughter McIver added to party U.S. Bank National Association(pty:pla). (McIver, Richard)
July 20, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Consent to Removal and Constitutional Right to Removal by John Krondes (cds)
July 14, 2020 Filing 3 Clerks Notice of Receipt of Filing Fee received on 7/14/2020 in the amount of $ 400.00, receipt number FLS000013173. (drz)
July 14, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks and Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (drz)
July 14, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT ) Filing fee $400.00 paid, filed by John Krondes. (State court documents were provided, see exhibit 1-2 ) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(drz) Modified on 7/15/2020 (drz).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Bank National Association v. Krondes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank National Association
Represented By: Richard Slaughter McIver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Krondes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?