Cutrone v. Inch
Plaintiff: Nicholas Cutrone
Defendant: Mark Inch
Case Number: 2:2020cv14250
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Shaniek M Maynard
Referring Judge: Robin L Rosenberg
2 Judge: Rodolfo A Ruiz
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #8 Order to Show Cause, by Mark Inch. (Bettendorf, Heidi)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER OF REFERENCE to Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard for Report and Recommendation. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 8/7/2020. See attached document for full details. (cds)
July 30, 2020 Filing 13 SECOND AMENDED/Corrected Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg and Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard. Judge Robin S. Rosenbaum, selected/assigned in error at DE #12; and Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II no longer assigned to case; AND assigned in error on 7/17/2020 (jmd)
July 30, 2020 Filing 12 AMENDED/Corrected Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin S. Rosenbaum and Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard. Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II no longer assigned to case; AND assigned in error on 7/17/2020. (jmd)
July 28, 2020 Filing 11 EXHIBITS 1, 2, 3, 4, 5, 6, 7 by Nicholas Cutrone. (Forman, Jason)
July 27, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Heidi L. Bettendorf on behalf of Mark Inch. Attorney Heidi L. Bettendorf added to party Mark Inch(pty:dft). (Bettendorf, Heidi)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave. The 45 page Petition #1 filed on July 17, 2020 is hereby deemed appropriately filed on that date. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 7/23/2020. (btr)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - 28 U.S.C. 2254. By no later than August 3, 2020, counsel for the Respondent shall file the name of the lawyer or lawyers to whom this case is assigned. Show Cause Response due by 9/14/2020. Petitioner shall file a reply by no later than September 28, 2020. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 7/20/2020. See attached document for full details. (jbs)
July 21, 2020 Filing 7 Agreed MOTION to Amend/Correct Clarified Motion to Exceed Legal Memorandum Page Limit by Nicholas Cutrone. Responses due by 8/4/2020 (Forman, Jason)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave. Petitioner may file a memorandum of law not to exceed 35 pages in length in support of his Petition. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 7/20/2020. (btr)
July 20, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of filing civil cover sheet by Nicholas Cutrone (Forman, Jason) Modified text on 7/21/2020 (lk).
July 18, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to File by Nicholas Cutrone. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Motion for Leave to Exceed Incorporated Memorandum of Law Page Limit)(Forman, Jason)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. No Civil Cover Sheet. Filer is instructed to file a Notice (Other) with the Civil Cover Sheet attached within 24 hours of the notice. (amb)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II. (amb)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 APPLICATION/PETITION (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2254 . Filing fee $ 5.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13199387, filed by Nicholas Cutrone.(Forman, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cutrone v. Inch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Inch
Represented By: Noticing 2254 SAG Broward and North
Represented By: Heidi L. Bettendorf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Cutrone
Represented By: Jason Todd Forman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?