LOZOTT v. KNIGHT et al
Plaintiff: ERIN LOZOTT
Defendant: Southern AG Carriers, Inc. and RICHARD KNIGHT
Case Number: 2:2020cv14288
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Shaniek M Maynard
Referring Judge: Donald M Middlebrooks
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE by RICHARD KNIGHT, Southern AG Carriers, Inc. Amended Notice of Removal to United States District Court (Stokes, Brian)
October 13, 2020 Filing 27 Defendant's MOTION to Amend/Correct Notice of Removal and Combined Memorandum of Law in Support by RICHARD KNIGHT, Southern AG Carriers, Inc.. Responses due by 10/27/2020 (Stokes, Brian)
October 8, 2020 Filing 26 REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),, filed by ERIN LOZOTT. (Greenlee, Andrew)
October 6, 2020 Filing 25 REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal with Prejudice #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),, Motion of Defendant, Richard Knight, to Dismiss with Prejudice and/or Strike Counts II and III of Defendant Knight's Reply Memorandum of Law to Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Knight's Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice and/or Strike Counts II and III (DOC. 22) filed by RICHARD KNIGHT. (Stokes, Brian)
October 5, 2020 Filing 24 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard: Scheduling Conference held on 10/5/2020. Total time in court: 10 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Brian David Stokes, Andrew Brooks Greenlee, Other appearances: Genevieve Geiger, Law Clerk. (Digital WebEx Conference SMM_04_10-05-2020) (cga)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER SETTING PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULE and ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MEDIATION: (Amended Pleadings due by 10/23/2020., Discovery due by 2/8/2021., Joinder of Parties due by 10/23/2020., In Limine Motions due by 3/22/2021., Dispositive Motions due by 2/22/2021., Motions due by 3/22/2021., Pretrial Stipulation due by 4/12/2021.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard on 10/5/2020. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
October 2, 2020 Filing 22 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal with Prejudice #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),, Motion of Defendant, Richard Knight, to Dismiss with Prejudice and/or Strike Counts II and III of filed by ERIN LOZOTT. Replies due by 10/9/2020. (Greenlee, Andrew)
October 1, 2020 Filing 21 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),, Defendants' Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss or Remand (DOC. 8) filed by RICHARD KNIGHT, Southern AG Carriers, Inc.. Replies due by 10/8/2020. (Stokes, Brian)
October 1, 2020 Filing 20 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by RICHARD KNIGHT, Southern AG Carriers, Inc. (Stokes, Brian)
September 30, 2020 Filing 19 Amended Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by RICHARD KNIGHT, Southern AG Carriers, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Great Western Casualty Company, Other Affiliate Kevin Lozott for RICHARD KNIGHT, Southern AG Carriers, Inc. (Stokes, Brian)
September 29, 2020 Filing 18 Clerks Notice to Filer re #16 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents Not Entered; ERROR - The Filer failed to enter all Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents from the Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Filer is instructed to refile their Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement and enter the missing Other Affiliates/Corp Parents. Note - Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents do not appear on the docket sheet. (mee)
September 29, 2020 Filing 17 Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by RICHARD KNIGHT, Southern AG Carriers, Inc. (Stokes, Brian)
September 29, 2020 Filing 16 Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by RICHARD KNIGHT, Southern AG Carriers, Inc. (Stokes, Brian)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PAPERLESS Order setting the telephonic Scheduling Conference for MONDAY 10/5/2020 at 2:00 PM in Fort Pierce Division before Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard. Counsel shall call the Court's telephone conference line number (888) 684-8852 and use Access Code 5312437. Pursuant to Local Rule 16.1(b), counsel for the parties shall confer and prepare a Joint Scheduling Report based on the already set trial date. The Joint Scheduling Report is due by 5:00 PM FRIDAY 10/2/2020. The parties shall begin pre-trial tasks now, in advance of the Scheduling Conference. This includes Initial Disclosures (which the parties shall exchange before the Scheduling Conference) and discovery. In other words the case already should be progressing by the time of the Scheduling Conference, and the Joint Scheduling Report should reflect that. This is necessary so that the parties can complete all pre-trial tasks within the time allotted and have the case ready for trial by the soon upcoming trial date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard on 9/25/2020. (ggr)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REFERRING CASE AND SETTING TRIAL DATE: (Jury Trial set for 5/10/2021 09:00 AM in Fort Pierce Division before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks., Calendar Call set for 5/5/2021 01:15 PM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard to conduct a Scheduling Conference. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 9/22/2020. See attached document for full details. (pcs) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
September 21, 2020 Filing 13 STATUS REPORT Defendant, Southern AG Carriers, Inc.'s, Amended Removal Status Report by Southern AG Carriers, Inc. (Stokes, Brian)
September 21, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE by Southern AG Carriers, Inc. Notice of Non-Filing of Opposition to Defendant, Southern AG Carriers, Inc.'s, Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint for Failure to Serve Process Pursuant to Florida Rule of Civil Procedure 1.070(J) and Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice and/or Strike Counts II and III of Plaintiff's Complaint (Stokes, Brian)
September 21, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE by RICHARD KNIGHT Defendant, Richard Knight's, Consent to Removal (Stokes, Brian)
September 21, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal with Prejudice #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),, Motion of Defendant, Richard Knight, to Dismiss with Prejudice and/or Strike Counts II and III of Plaintiff's Complaint by RICHARD KNIGHT. Responses due by 10/5/2020 (Stokes, Brian)
September 21, 2020 Filing 9 Answer and Defenses of Defendant, Richard Knight ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by RICHARD KNIGHT. Attorney Brian David Stokes added to party RICHARD KNIGHT(pty:dft). (Stokes, Brian)
September 18, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),, by ERIN LOZOTT. Responses due by 10/2/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Greenlee, Andrew)
September 18, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrew Brooks Greenlee on behalf of ERIN LOZOTT. Attorney Andrew Brooks Greenlee added to party ERIN LOZOTT(pty:pla). (Greenlee, Andrew)
August 25, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE by Southern AG Carriers, Inc. Defendant, Southern AG Carriers, Inc.'s, Notice of Service of Proposal for Settlement to Plaintiff (Stokes, Brian)
August 25, 2020 Filing 5 STATUS REPORT Defendant, Southern AG Carriers, Inc.'s, Removal Status Report by Southern AG Carriers, Inc. (Stokes, Brian)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REQUIRING REMOVAL STATUS REPORT Status Report due by 9/3/2020. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 8/20/2020. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Michael B. Scoma, mailing date 08/19/2020, (cco)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks and Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pcs)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13375154, filed by Southern AG Carriers, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s) Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit Exhibit O)(Stokes, Brian) State Court Answer and Motion to Dismiss filed. Modified on 8/19/2020 (pcs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LOZOTT v. KNIGHT et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERIN LOZOTT
Represented By: Michael B. Scoma
Represented By: Andrew Brooks Greenlee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern AG Carriers, Inc.
Represented By: Brian David Stokes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD KNIGHT
Represented By: Brian David Stokes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?