Page et al v. O'Leary et al
Plaintiff: Robin Page, Fabricio Vasquez and Westin Landis
Defendant: William D Snyder, Steven O'Leary, Sheriff William D Snyder and Deputy Sheriff Steven O'Leary
Case Number: 2:2020cv14460
Filed: December 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Aileen M Cannon
Referring Judge: Shaniek M Maynard
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2021 Filing 14 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Westin Landis, Robin Page, Fabricio Vasquez (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rubin, Guy)
February 18, 2021 Filing 13 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by William D Snyder (Barranco, Summer)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PAPERLESS ORDER: In light of Plaintiff's Amended Complaint #10 , Defendant's Motion #9 for a More Definite Statement is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 2/17/2021. (ad00)
February 17, 2021 Filing 11 Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Westin Landis, Robin Page, Fabricio Vasquez (Rubin, Guy)
February 17, 2021 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Robin Page, Westin Landis, Fabricio Vasquez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Rubin, Guy)
January 28, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for More Definite Statement by William D Snyder. (Barranco, Summer)
January 28, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Summer Marie Barranco on behalf of William D Snyder. Attorney Summer Marie Barranco added to party William D Snyder(pty:dft). (Barranco, Summer)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES Joint Scheduling Report due by 2/19/2021 Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 1/24/2021. See attached document for full details. (jbs)
January 21, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Robin Page, Westin Landis, Fabricio Vasquez. Steven O'Leary served on 1/11/2021, answer due 2/1/2021; William D Snyder served on 1/7/2021, answer due 1/28/2021. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit OLeary, #2 Affidavit Snyder)(Rubin, Guy)
December 28, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Steven O'Leary, William D Snyder. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s))(jbs)
December 23, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE by Westin Landis, Robin Page, Fabricio Vasquez re #1 Complaint, of Filing Civil Cover Sheet and Summonses for Issuance (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s) Summons for Issuance-O'Leary, #3 Summon(s) Summons for Issuance-Snyder) (Rubin, Guy)
December 23, 2020 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. No Civil Cover Sheet. Filer is instructed to file a Notice (Other) with the Civil Cover Sheet attached within 24 hours of the notice. (jbs)
December 22, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Aileen M. Cannon and Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jbs)
December 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Steven O'Leary, William D Snyder. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number BFLSDC-14083189, filed by Robin Page, Westin Landis, Fabricio Vasquez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Rubin, Guy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Page et al v. O'Leary et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin Page
Represented By: Guy Bennett Rubin
Represented By: Todd Martin Norbraten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fabricio Vasquez
Represented By: Guy Bennett Rubin
Represented By: Todd Martin Norbraten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Westin Landis
Represented By: Guy Bennett Rubin
Represented By: Todd Martin Norbraten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William D Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven O'Leary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff William D Snyder
Represented By: Summer Marie Barranco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Sheriff Steven O'Leary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?