United States Of America v. Sharfi et al
Plaintiff: United States Of America
Defendant: Benjamin K. Sharfi and NeshaFarm, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2021cv14205
Filed: May 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Kenneth A Marra
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33 U.S.C. ยง 1319
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Benjamin K. Sharfi. Responses due by 7/6/2021 (Hamilton, Christopher)
June 22, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by NeshaFarm, Inc.. (Hamilton, Christopher)
June 22, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Benjamin K. Sharfi. (Hamilton, Christopher)
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to a Complaint. NeshaFarm, Inc. Answer due 6/22/2021; Benjamin K. Sharfi Answer due 6/22/2021. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 6/8/2021. See attached document for full details. (ir)
June 8, 2021 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint by NeshaFarm, Inc., Benjamin K. Sharfi. Attorney Christopher Frederick Hamilton added to party NeshaFarm, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher Frederick Hamilton added to party Benjamin K. Sharfi(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Hamilton, Christopher)
June 2, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by United States Of America. NeshaFarm, Inc. served on 5/18/2021, answer due 6/8/2021. (Adkins, Brandon)
June 2, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by United States Of America. Benjamin K. Sharfi served on 5/22/2021, answer due 6/14/2021. (Adkins, Brandon)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Requiring Counsel to Confer and File Joint Scheduling Report. Signed by Judge Kenneth A. Marra on 5/15/2021. See attached document for full details. (ir)
May 13, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to NeshaFarm, Inc., Benjamin K. Sharfi. (pcs)
May 12, 2021 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Kenneth A. Marra. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pcs)
May 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 402.00. USA Filer - No Filing Fee Required, filed by United States Of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Doyle, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States Of America v. Sharfi et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin K. Sharfi
Represented By: Christopher Frederick Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NeshaFarm, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Frederick Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States Of America
Represented By: Andrew James Doyle
Represented By: Brandon N. Adkins
Represented By: Dexter Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?