Molyneux v. Internal Revenue Service
Plaintiff: Adam Molyneux and Dwayne Scott
Defendant: Internal Revenue Service
Case Number: 2:2021cv14249
Filed: June 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: K Michael Moore
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE. All pending motions, if any, are DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge K. Michael Moore on 7/13/2021. See attached document for full details. (thn)
July 9, 2021 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Internal Revenue Service, filed by Adam Molyneux. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(cqs)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. The Complaint #1 is hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Pursuant to Rule 15(a)(2) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Plaintiff is granted leave to file an amended complaint within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Order. Signed by Chief Judge K. Michael Moore on 6/21/2021. (thn)
June 17, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Adam Molyneux. (pcs)
June 17, 2021 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Chief Judge K. Michael Moore. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pcs)
June 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Internal Revenue Service. Filing fees $ 402.00. IFP Filed, filed by Adam Molyneux. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(pcs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Molyneux v. Internal Revenue Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Molyneux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dwayne Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Internal Revenue Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?