Innovative Vehicle Solutions West, LLC v. Renntech, Inc.
Plaintiff: Innovative Vehicle Solutions West, LLC d/b/a El Kapitan and Innovative Vehicle Solutions West, LLC doing business as El Kapitan
Defendant: Renntech, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2021cv14404
Filed: October 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Aileen M Cannon
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1330
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2021 Filing 21 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Innovative Vehicle Solutions West, LLC (Allen, Todd)
November 28, 2021 Set Deadlines per DE 20 Order as to #16 Amended MOTION to Dismiss. Response due by 12/13/2021. (kpe)
November 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 PAPERLESS ORDER granting the parties' #19 Joint Motion to Approve Second Stipulation to Extend Time for Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Amended Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff shall respond to Defendant's Amended Motion to Dismiss on or before December 13, 2021. No further extensions of this deadline will be granted. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 11/28/2021. (ad)
November 24, 2021 Filing 19 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to 15 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, to file a response to Defendant's Amended Motion to Dismiss by Innovative Vehicle Solutions West, LLC. (Allen, Todd)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 PAPERLESS ORDER: In light of Defendant's Amended Motion to Dismiss #16 , Defendant's Motion to Dismiss #11 is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 11/16/2021. (ad)
November 12, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE by Renntech, Inc. Request for Judicial Notice (McCluskey, Michael)
November 12, 2021 Filing 16 Amended MOTION to Dismiss #5 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal, by Renntech, Inc.. Responses due by 11/29/2021 (McCluskey, Michael)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PAPERLESS ORDER granting the parties' #12 Joint Motion for an Order Approving Stipulation. Defendant shall file an Amended Motion to Dismiss on or before November 12, 2021. Thereafter, Plaintiff shall file a response to Defendant's Amended Motion to Dismiss on or before November 30, 2021. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 11/12/2021. (ad)
November 10, 2021 Filing 14 Amended MOTION for Extension of Time for Defendant to have until November 12, 2021, to file an Amended Motion to Dismiss and for Plaintiff to have until November 30, 2021, to file its response re #11 MOTION to Dismiss #5 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal, by Innovative Vehicle Solutions West, LLC. Responses due by 11/24/2021 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time)(Allen, Todd)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PAPERLESS ORDER striking #12 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant Renntech Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff's Motion does not contain a certificate of conference, as required by S.D. Fla. L.R. 7.1(a)(3). Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 11/4/2021. (jrt)
November 4, 2021 Filing 12 STRICKEN - MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #11 MOTION to Dismiss #5 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal, by Innovative Vehicle Solutions West, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time)(Allen, Todd) Modified/Stricken per DE 13 on 11/5/2021 (pes).
November 2, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss #5 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal, by Renntech, Inc.. Responses due by 11/16/2021 (McCluskey, Michael)
November 2, 2021 Filing 10 Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by Renntech, Inc. (McCluskey, Michael)
November 2, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael John McCluskey on behalf of Renntech, Inc.. Attorney Michael John McCluskey added to party Renntech, Inc.(pty:dft). (McCluskey, Michael)
October 15, 2021 Filing 8 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Innovative Vehicle Solutions West, LLC identifying Corporate Parent IVS International, Inc., Corporate Parent Innovative Vehicle Solutions, LLC, Other Affiliate Kelsey Hazzard, Esq., Other Affiliate Lindsay & Allen, PLLC for Innovative Vehicle Solutions West, LLC (Bermudez, Victor)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REQUIRING JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES. Joint Scheduling Report due by 12/2/2021. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 10/14/2021. See attached document for full details. (amb)
October 12, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,, with a response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 15 as determined by the attorney/filer of 11/01/2021 by Innovative Vehicle Solutions West, LLC. Renntech, Inc. served on 10/11/2021., answer due by 11/1/2021. (Allen, Todd) Modified text on 10/12/2021 (jao).
October 12, 2021 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR A JURY TRIAL against Renntech, Inc., filed by Innovative Vehicle Solutions West, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ford Agreement, #2 Exhibit Agreement Innovative Vehicle Solutions, LLC and RENNTECH, #3 Exhibit Corresp between parties summer - fall 2017, #4 Exhibit SEMA Ford Transit Van Project Completion Plan, #5 Exhibit Excerpts Fords Body & Equip Mounting Manual, #6 Exhibit Assignment of Claims)(Allen, Todd)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO CLARIFY CITIZENSHIP re #1 Complaint, filed by Innovative Vehicle Solutions West, LLC, ( Amended Complaint due by 10/12/2021.) Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 10/8/2021. See attached document for full details. (jao)
October 6, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Renntech, Inc. (jao)
October 5, 2021 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Aileen M. Cannon. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jao)
October 5, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Renntech, Inc.. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15069447, filed by Innovative Vehicle Solutions West, LLC d/b/a El Kapitan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex1 Ford Agreement, #2 Exhibit Ex 2 Agreement Innovative Vehicle Solutions, LLC and RENNTECH, #3 Exhibit Ex 3 Corresp between parties summer - fall 2017, #4 Exhibit Ex 4 SEMA Ford Transit Van Project Completion Plan, #5 Exhibit Ex 5 Excerpts Fords Body & Equip Mounting Manual, #6 Exhibit Ex 6 Assignment of Claims, #7 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Summon(s) Summons)(Allen, Todd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Innovative Vehicle Solutions West, LLC v. Renntech, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Innovative Vehicle Solutions West, LLC d/b/a El Kapitan
Represented By: Todd Bruce Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Innovative Vehicle Solutions West, LLC doing business as El Kapitan
Represented By: Victor Ruben Bermudez
Represented By: Todd Bruce Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renntech, Inc.
Represented By: Michael John McCluskey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?