Matthews v. Secretary, Florida Department of Corrections et al
Plaintiff: Eugene F. Matthews
Defendant: Secretary, Florida Department of Corrections and Rizilard
Case Number: 2:2022cv14030
Filed: January 20, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Raag Singhal
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 State Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing Correspondence by Eugene F. Matthews re #5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (ls)
February 15, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Eugene F. Matthews. (ls)
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE LITIGANT. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 2/3/2022. See attached document for full details. (ls)
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REQUIRING PAYMENT OF FILING FEE OR FILING OF MOTION TO PROCEED IFP WITH DETAILED AFFIDAVIT. Filing Fee due by 2/24/2022. Motions due by 2/24/2022. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 2/3/2022. See attached document for full details. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs) (ls)
January 20, 2022 Filing 2 Judge Assignment to Judge Raag Singhal. (daa)
January 20, 2022 Filing 1 Complaint pursuant to 42 USC 1983 against Rizilard, Secretary, Florida Department of Corrections. Filing fee $ 402.00 (Filing fee not paid/IFP Motion not filed),, filed by Eugene F. Matthews.(daa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Matthews v. Secretary, Florida Department of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugene F. Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary, Florida Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rizilard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?