Juanita Anderson v. Fort Pierce Police Department
Plaintiff: Juanita Anderson
Defendant: Fort Pierce Police Department, Ken J. Mascra, Denise Dueball, Sgt. Harris, Sgt. Dove and Sgt. Senfield
Case Number: 2:2023cv14347
Filed: November 3, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Kathleen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 State Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2023 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Sgt. Dove, Denise Dueball, Fort Pierce Police Department, Sgt. Harris, Ken J. Mascra, Sgt. Senfield re #11 ORDER re #1 Complaint 42 USC 1983 or Bivens filed by Juanita Anderson, filed by Juanita Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(rbe)
November 28, 2023 Filing 12 CLERK'S Notice Of Compliance re #11 ORDER re #1 Complaint 42 USC 1983 or Bivens filed by Juanita Anderson. A copy of this order was provided. Additionally, the civil rights form was provided. (Attachments: #1 Civil Rights Form) (rbe)
November 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER re #1 Complaint 42 USC 1983 or Bivens filed by Juanita Anderson. Plaintiff's Complaint (DE #1 ) is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. On or before December 28, 2023, Plaintiff may, if he so chooses, file an Amended Complaint using the authorized form that accompanies this Order, curing the deficiencies identified herein. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 11/28/2023. See attached document for full details. (Attachments: #1 Civil Rights Form) (rbe)
November 28, 2023 Filing 10 CLERK'S Notice Of Compliance re #9 ORDER GRANTING #8 PLAINTIFF IN FORMA PAUPERIS STATUS AND ESTABLISHING A DEBT OF $350.00. A copy of this order was provided. Additional Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) sent to Financial Clerk. (rbe)
November 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING #8 PLAINTIFF IN FORMA PAUPERIS STATUS AND ESTABLISHING A DEBT OF $350.00. Plaintiff owes the United States a debt of $350.00 which must be paid to the Clerk of Court as funds become available.The facility having custody of Plaintiff shall make payments from Plaintiff's inmate account to the Clerk of this Court each time the amount in the account exceeds $10.00 until the full filing fee of $350.00 is paid. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 11/28/2023. See attached document for full details. (rbe)
November 24, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Juanita Anderson. (rbe)
November 3, 2023 Filing 7 CLERK'S Notice Of Compliance re #6 CORRECTED ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND REQUIRING PAYMENT OF FILING FEE OR RENEWED MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. A copy of this order and the form was mailed to the plaintiff. (Attachments: #1 IFP Form) (rbe)
November 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CORRECTED ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND REQUIRING PAYMENT OF FILING FEE OR RENEWED MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. DENYING #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Filing Fee due by 12/5/2023. Motions due by 12/5/2023. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 11/3/2023. See attached document for full details. (Attachments: #1 IFP form) Text Modified on 11/6/2023 (mee).
November 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND REQUIRING PAYMENT OF FILING FEE OR RENEWED MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Plaintiff's IFP Application (DE #3 ) is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE because it was not accompanied by the required six-month inmate account statement. On or before December 5, 2023, Plaintiff shall either pay the $402.00 filing fee or shall complete and file the form IFP Application to proceed without payment of fees, which is attached to this Order. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 11/3/2023. See attached document for full details. (rbe)
November 3, 2023 Filing 4 INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE LITIGANT. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 11/3/2023. See attached document for full details. (rbe)
November 3, 2023 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Juanita Anderson. (kma)
November 3, 2023 Filing 2 Judge Assignment to Judge Kathleen M. Williams (kma)
November 3, 2023 Filing 1 Complaint pursuant to 42 USC 1983 against Fort Pierce Police Department. Filing fee $ 402.00 (IFP Motion filed), filed by Juanita Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kma)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Juanita Anderson v. Fort Pierce Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juanita Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fort Pierce Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken J. Mascra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denise Dueball
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Dove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Senfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?