Tovarian v. Rubic, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Aleksey Tovarian
Defendant: Rubic, LLC, Kateryna Panova and John Doe
Case Number: 2:2024cv14037
Filed: February 9, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Aileen M Cannon
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Libel, Assault, Slander
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2024 Filing 23 REPLY to Response to Motion re #18 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Kateryna Panova. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Fee Agreement)(Slater, James)
April 2, 2024 Filing 22 RESPONSE in Opposition re #18 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Aleksey Tovarian. Replies due by 4/9/2024. (Arcadier, Mauricio)
April 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER REQUIRING RESPONSE TO MOTION re #17 MOTION TO DISMISS #14 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Rubic, LLC, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings as to #17 MOTION TO DISMISS #14 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . Plaintiff shall file a response to the motion on or before April 12, 2024. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 4/2/2024. See attached document for full details. (mee)
April 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 20 PAPERLESS ORDER denying #15 Motion to Remand to State Court. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 4/2/2024. (AMC)
March 20, 2024 Filing 19 PAPERLESS ORDER: In light of Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint #14 , Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint #10 is denied as moot. Signed Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 3/20/2024. (mp01)
March 19, 2024 Filing 18 MOTION for Attorney Fees by Kateryna Panova. Responses due by 4/2/2024. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of James Slater)(Slater, James)
March 12, 2024 Filing 17 MOTION TO DISMISS #14 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Rubic, LLC. Responses due by 3/26/2024. (Slater, James)
March 12, 2024 Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Kateryna Panova, Rubic, LLC. Replies due by 3/19/2024. (Slater, James)
March 11, 2024 Filing 15 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Aleksey Tovarian. (Arcadier, Mauricio)
March 11, 2024 Filing 14 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against Rubic, LLC filed in response to Order Granting Motion for Leave, filed by Aleksey Tovarian. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Arcadier, Mauricio)
February 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER TO CLARIFY SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION. Second Amended Complaint due by 3/11/2024. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 2/28/2024. See attached document for full details. (mee)
February 28, 2024 Filing 12 STATUS REPORT on Removal by Kateryna Panova, Rubic, LLC (Slater, James)
February 28, 2024 Filing 11 NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICES IN REMOVAL CASES. Removal Status Report due by 3/4/2024. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 2/28/2024. See attached document for full details. (mee)
February 26, 2024 Filing 10 MOTION TO DISMISS #9 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Kateryna Panova, Rubic, LLC. Responses due by 3/11/2024. (Slater, James)
February 26, 2024 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Kateryna Panova, Rubic, LLC filed in response to Order Granting Motion for Leave, filed by Aleksey Tovarian. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Arcadier, Mauricio)
February 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REQUIRING COMBINED RESPONSES. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 2/13/2024. See attached document for full details. (mee)
February 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT AND PERMITTING REPLEADING, denying as moot #3 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Amended Complaint due by 3/4/2024. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 2/13/2024. See attached document for full details. (mee)
February 10, 2024 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Rubic, LLC (Slater, James)
February 9, 2024 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT signed by: Maksim Kharitonov by Kateryna Panova, Rubic, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Translation of Kiselev WhatsApp Voice Memo)(Slater, James)
February 9, 2024 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT signed by: James M. Slater by Kateryna Panova, Rubic, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Translation of Subject Rubic Article, #2 Exhibit TeachBK YouTube Search)(Slater, James)
February 9, 2024 Filing 3 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Kateryna Panova, Rubic, LLC. Responses due by 2/23/2024. (Slater, James)
February 9, 2024 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Aileen M. Cannon. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (rbe)
February 9, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT ) Filing fee $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-17281484, filed by Kateryna Panova, Rubic, LLC. No Answer / No Motion To Dismiss Filed.(Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit State Court Complaint/ Docket, #3 Exhibit Declaration of Kateryna Panova, #4 Exhibit Declaration of James Slater, #5 Exhibit Notice to Circuit Court)(Slater, James) Modified Text & Attachment Description on 2/9/2024 (rbe).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tovarian v. Rubic, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aleksey Tovarian
Represented By: Mauricio Arcadier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rubic, LLC
Represented By: James Murray Slater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kateryna Panova
Represented By: James Murray Slater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?