The United States of America v. Jones et al
Plaintiff: The United States of America
Defendant: Del Jones as Successor Trustee for VCH Trust, Jack Sweeting, Lorna M Glaze, Lorna Glaze as Trustee for GLMH Trust, Lorna Glaze, Del Jones and Lorna M. Glaze
Case Number: 4:2019cv10100
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: James Lawrence King
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2019 Filing 15 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE as to #14 Notice of Lis Pendens. (ar2)
July 19, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Lis Pendens by The United States of America for property located at Monroe County ; Grantees: Del Jones as the Successor Trustee of The VCH Trust and Lorna Glaze as Trustee of The GLMH Trust (Treanor, T. C.)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Service by Publication. Signed by Senior Judge James Lawrence King on 7/15/2019. See attached document for full details. (ch1)
July 12, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Service by Publication by The United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 55, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Treanor, T. C.)
July 1, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #4 Amended Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by The United States of America. Jack Sweeting served on 6/28/2019, answer due 7/19/2019. (Treanor, T. C.)
June 27, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Jack Sweeting. (lk) (Main Document 10 replaced on 6/27/2019) (lk). Modified text and replaced document on 6/27/2019 (lk).
June 27, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Del Jones. (lk)
June 27, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Lorna Glaze. (lk)
June 26, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by The United States of America re #1 Complaint, filed by The United States of America (Treanor, T. C.)
June 26, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by The United States of America re #1 Complaint, filed by The United States of America (Treanor, T. C.)
June 26, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by The United States of America re #1 Complaint, filed by The United States of America (Treanor, T. C.)
June 17, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by The United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Treanor, T. C.)
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Lorna Glaze, Del Jones, Jack Sweeting. (ar2)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Senior Judge James Lawrence King. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ar2)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00. USA Filer - No Filing Fee Required, filed by The United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Summon(s), #11 Summon(s), #12 Summon(s), #13 Civil Cover Sheet)(Treanor, T. C.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The United States of America v. Jones et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The United States of America
Represented By: T. C. Treanor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Del Jones as Successor Trustee for VCH Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack Sweeting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lorna M Glaze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lorna Glaze as Trustee for GLMH Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lorna Glaze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Del Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lorna M. Glaze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?