RM & ASSOCIATES CONSULTING, INC. v. Selective Insurance Company of the Southeast
Plaintiff: RM & ASSOCIATES CONSULTING, INC.
Defendant: Selective Insurance Company of the Southeast
Case Number: 4:2019cv10131
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Jose E Martinez
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss #10 Amended Complaint and Memorandum of Law by Selective Insurance Company of the Southeast. Responses due by 10/7/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(McNabney, Joel)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying as moot #5 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 9/10/2019. See attached document for full details. (ail)
September 9, 2019 Filing 10 Plaintiff's AMENDED COMPLAINT against Selective Insurance Company of the Southeast, filed by RM & ASSOCIATES CONSULTING, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Assignment of Benefits)(Font, Jose)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #8 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff shall respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss #5 on or before September 9, 2019. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 9/4/2019. (ean)
August 30, 2019 Filing 8 Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #5 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint) and Memorandum of Law by RM & ASSOCIATES CONSULTING, INC.. (Font, Jose)
August 19, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Selective Insurance Company of the Southeast identifying Corporate Parent SELECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA for Selective Insurance Company of the Southeast (McNabney, Joel)
August 19, 2019 Filing 6 STATUS REPORT by Selective Insurance Company of the Southeast (McNabney, Joel)
August 19, 2019 Filing 5 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint) and Memorandum of Law by Selective Insurance Company of the Southeast. Responses due by 9/3/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(McNabney, Joel)
August 13, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Court Practice in Removal Cases. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 8/13/2019. See attached document for full details. (dq)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 8/13/2019. See attached document for full details. (dq)
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Jose E. Martinez. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (amb)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11893334, filed by Selective Insurance Company of the Southeast. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(McNabney, Joel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RM & ASSOCIATES CONSULTING, INC. v. Selective Insurance Company of the Southeast
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Selective Insurance Company of the Southeast
Represented By: Eugene P. Murphy
Represented By: Joel Ladd McNabney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RM & ASSOCIATES CONSULTING, INC.
Represented By: Jose Pete Font
Represented By: Jaime Eileen Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?