Scott v. Dugan
Plaintiff: Ronald Scott
Defendant: State Attorney Kelly Dugan
Case Number: 4:2019cv10200
Filed: November 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: K Michael Moore
Referring Judge: Lisette M Reid
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff to Proceed without Prepayment of Filing Fee but Establishing Debt to Clerk of $350.00. Granting to the extent that the plaintiff need not prepay even a partial filing fee in this case, or to prepay costs such as for service of process. USM Service NOT Ordered. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 12/19/2019. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
December 9, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Ronald Scott. (lk)
November 26, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing Rejection of Service of Process. (cds)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Petitioner filed his/her motion to proceed in forma pauperis but failed to submit the supporting statement certified by the appropriate institutional officer showing all receipts, expenditures, and balances during the last six months for any institutional account in her name. Accordingly, on or before December 19, 2019, Petitioner shall file the required supporting, certified inmate account statement, or pay the Clerks filing fee of $400.00. Responses due by 12/19/2019 Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 11/19/2019. See attached document for full details. (Attachments: #1 IFP Form) (fbn)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE CIVIL RIGHTS LITIGANTS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 11/19/2019. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
November 13, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Ronald Scott. (pes)
November 13, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Chief Judge K. Michael Moore and Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid. Pursuant to Administrative Order 2019-2, this matter is referred to the Magistrate Judge for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters. (pes)
November 13, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint pursuant to 42 USC 1983 against Kelly Dugan. Filing fee $ 400.00. IFP Filed, filed by Ronald Scott.(pes)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scott v. Dugan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Attorney Kelly Dugan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?