Lacross Marina, LLC v. M/V Unclaimed, a 63' Sea Ray 1994 Fiberglass Vessel, bearing USCG Official No. 1025018 and Hull ID No. SERY0093J395, her engines, tackle, equipment, appurtenances, etc., in rem, et al
Plaintiff: Lacross Marina, LLC, a Florida Limited Liability Company agent of d/b/a Key Largo Harbor Marina and Lacross Marina, LLC a Florida Limited Liability Company agent of d/b/a Key Largo Harbor Marina
Defendant: Joseph A. Colabella in personam., M/V Unclaimed, a 63' Sea Ray 1994 Fiberglass Vessel, bearing USCG Official No. 1025018 and Hull ID No. SERY0093J395, her engines, tackle, equipment, appurtenances, etc., in rem, and Joseph A. Colabella
Case Number: 4:2021cv10059
Filed: June 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: James Lawrence King
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2021 Filing 11 Notice of Action/Publication filed by Lacross Marina, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Gardana, Robert)
July 16, 2021 Filing 10 Notice of Action/Publication filed by Lacross Marina, LLC. M/V Unclaimed, a 63' Sea Ray 1994 Fiberglass Vessel, bearing USCG Official No. 1025018 and Hull ID No. SERY0093J395, her engines, tackle, equipment, appurtenances, etc., in rem, answer/written defenses due by 8/12/2021. (Gardana, Robert)
July 15, 2021 Filing 9 WARRANT FOR ARREST IN REM Returned Executed as to M/V Unclaimed, Unclaimed,a 63'Sea.Ray1994 Fiberglass Vessel,bearing USCG OfficialNo.1025018 'and Hull etc. (cds)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Granting #7 Motion to Appoint Custodian Lacross Marina, LLC, a Florida Limited Liability Company appointed. Signed by Senior Judge James Lawrence King on 6/16/2021. See attached document for full details. (jw)
June 15, 2021 Filing 7 Plaintiff's MOTION to Appoint Lacross Marina, LLC., d/b/a Key Largo Harbor Marina as Custodian Motion for Appointment of Substitute Custodian by Lacross Marina, LLC. Responses due by 6/29/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Errata, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Gardana, Robert)
June 15, 2021 Filing 6 Warrant In Rem Issued as to M/V Unclaimed, a 63' Sea Ray 1994 Fiberglass Vessel, bearing USCG Official No. 1025018 and Hull ID No. SERY0093J395, her engines, tackle, equipment, appurtenances, etc., in rem,. Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 6/15/2021. See attached document for full details. (cds)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DIRECTING THE ISSUANCE OF THE WARRANT FOR ARREST, Motions terminated: #4 MOTION Order Directing the Issuance of the Warrant for Arrest re #1 Complaint, filed by Lacross Marina, LLC. Signed by Senior Judge James Lawrence King on 6/15/2021. See attached document for full details. (cds)
June 14, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION Order Directing the Issuance of the Warrant for Arrest re #1 Complaint, by Lacross Marina, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gardana, Robert)
June 10, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Joseph A. Colabella. (cds)
June 9, 2021 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Senior Judge James Lawrence King. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (cds)
June 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT VERIFIED COMPLAINT TO FORECLOSE A MARITIME LIEN against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14753395, filed by Lacross Marina, LLC, a Florida Limited Liability Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summon(s), #5 Warrant, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Gardana, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lacross Marina, LLC v. M/V Unclaimed, a 63' Sea Ray 1994 Fiberglass Vessel, bearing USCG Official No. 1025018 and Hull ID No. SERY0093J395, her engines, tackle, equipment, appurtenances, etc., in rem, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph A. Colabella in personam.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M/V Unclaimed, a 63' Sea Ray 1994 Fiberglass Vessel, bearing USCG Official No. 1025018 and Hull ID No. SERY0093J395, her engines, tackle, equipment, appurtenances, etc., in rem,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph A. Colabella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lacross Marina, LLC, a Florida Limited Liability Company agent of d/b/a Key Largo Harbor Marina
Represented By: Robert L. Gardana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lacross Marina, LLC a Florida Limited Liability Company agent of d/b/a Key Largo Harbor Marina
Represented By: Robert L. Gardana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?