Bounds v. 16TH Judicial Circuit Court of Florida et al
Plaintiff: Adam Bruce Bounds
Defendant: 16TH Judicial Circuit Court of Florida, F.W.C. Florida Fish Wildlife, M.C.S.O Monroe County Sheriff's Office and Capt. David Dipre
Case Number: 4:2021cv10066
Filed: July 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Roy K Altman
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2021 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT against 16TH Judicial Circuit Court of Florida, David Dipre, F.W.C. Florida Fish Wildlife, M.C.S.O Monroe County Sheriff's Office, filed by Adam Bruce Bounds.(kpe)
August 3, 2021 Filing 12 Letter to Judge Roy K Altman from Adam B Bounds. (scn)
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER. The Complaint [ECF No. #1 ] is DISMISSED without prejudice. Any pending motions are DENIED as moot. All deadlines are TERMINATED. And the Clerk is instructed to CLOSE this case. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 7/27/2021. See attached document for full details. (daa)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PAPERLESS ORDER striking #4 Motion to Dismiss Civilian Witness Interview; striking #5 Letter. The Motion to Dismiss [ECF No. #4 ] is unintelligible and doesn't look like a filing intended for this Court. This is because the Motion's heading indicates the Plaintiff meant to file it in the "Sixteenth Judicial Circuit in and for Monroe County, Florida." Motion at 1. Since the Motion to Dismiss is unintelligible and inapposite, the Clerk's Office is INSTRUCTED to strike the Motion [ECF No. #4 ]. The Plaintiff also filed a Letter [ECF No. #5 ], which seeks no relief. Since the Letter has no bearing on this action, the Clerk's Office is INSTRUCTED to strike the Letter [ECF No. #5 ]. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman (bca)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PAPERLESS ORDER denying as moot #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed IFP; striking #7 Letter. Since the Plaintiff paid the filing fee, see Clerk]s Notice of Receipt of Filing Fee [ECF No. #8 ], his IFP Motion [ECF No. #3 ] is DENIED as moot. The Plaintiff's Letter [ECF No. #7 ], moreover, is not a motion and is evidently a letter alerting the Court that he would soon pay the filing fee. Since the Letter isn't a motion and the filing fee has already been paid, the Clerk's Office is INSTRUCTED to strike the Letter [ECF No. #7 ] from the docket. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman (bca)
July 20, 2021 Filing 8 Clerks Notice of Receipt of Filing Fee received on 7/20/2021 in the amount of $ 402.00, receipt numbers FLS100233045 and FLS100233048. (asz)
July 20, 2021 Filing 5 STRICKEN PURSUANT TO ORDER ECF No. 10 Letter to Judge Roy K Altman from Adam B Bounds. (scn) Modified text on 7/22/2021 (daa).
July 19, 2021 Filing 7 STRICKEN PURSUANT TO ORDER ECF No. 9 NOTICE re Inmate Account by Adam Bruce Bounds. (scn) Modified text on 7/22/2021 (daa).
July 19, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for an Emergency Injunction by Adam Bruce Bounds. (scn) Modified text on 7/22/2021 (daa).
July 16, 2021 Filing 4 STRICKEN PURSUANT TO ORDER ECF No. 10 NOTICE of Filing Motion to Dismiss Civilian Witness Interview in State Court Case by Adam Bruce Bounds. (scn) Modified text on 7/22/2021 (daa).
July 7, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Adam Bruce Bounds. (daa)
July 7, 2021 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Roy K. Altman. (daa)
July 7, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint pursuant to 42 USC 1983 against 16TH Judicial Circuit Court of Florida, David Dipre, F.W.C. Florida Fish Wildlife, M.C.S.O Monroe County Sheriff's Office. Filing fee $ 402.00. IFP Filed, filed by Adam Bruce Bounds. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(daa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bounds v. 16TH Judicial Circuit Court of Florida et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Bruce Bounds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 16TH Judicial Circuit Court of Florida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F.W.C. Florida Fish Wildlife
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.C.S.O Monroe County Sheriff's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capt. David Dipre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?