National Indemnity Company of The South v. Discount Rock & Sand, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: National Indemnity Company of The South
Defendant: Discount Rock & Sand, Inc., Carlos Manso Blanco, RICARDO SANCHEZ, ELIA BONFANTE, FRANCISCO CORTES, JULIO LOPEZ-BERMEJO ROSSELLO, DANIEL PINKERTON and KIMBERLY PINKERTON
Case Number: 4:2021cv10081
Filed: August 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Donald L Graham
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2021 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by National Indemnity Company of The South. ELIA BONFANTE waiver sent on 9/28/2021, answer due 11/29/2021; JULIO LOPEZ-BERMEJO ROSSELLO waiver sent on 9/28/2021, answer due 11/29/2021; RICARDO SANCHEZ waiver sent on 9/28/2021, answer due 11/29/2021. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s) signed Waiver of Service of Summons - Rossello, #2 Summon(s) signed Waiver of Service of Summons - Sanchez, #3 Summon(s) signed Waiver of Service of Summons - Bonfante, #4 Summon(s) signed Waiver of Service of Summons - Cortes)(Drawas, Jesse)
September 28, 2021 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by National Indemnity Company of The South. FRANCISCO CORTES waiver sent on 9/28/2021, answer due 11/29/2021. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s) Waiver of Service - Signed F. Cortes)(Gomez, Maritza)
September 24, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against National Indemnity Company of The South by Discount Rock & Sand, Inc.. Attorney Patricia Maria Baloyra added to party Discount Rock & Sand, Inc. (pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Baloyra, Patricia)
September 21, 2021 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by National Indemnity Company of The South. DANIEL PINKERTON waiver sent on 9/8/2021, answer due 11/8/2021. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s) Signed Waiver of the Service of Summons - D. Pinkerton)(Drawas, Jesse)
September 21, 2021 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by National Indemnity Company of The South. KIMBERLY PINKERTON waiver sent on 9/8/2021, answer due 11/8/2021. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s) Signed Waiver of the Service of Summons - K. Pinkerton)(Drawas, Jesse)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant Discount Rock & Sand, Inc. Answer or responsive pleading shall be due on or before September 24, 2021. No further extensions will be granted throughout the entirety of this litigation. Signed by Senior Judge Donald L. Graham on 9/9/2021. See attached document for full details. (amb)
September 9, 2021 Set/Reset Answer Due Deadline per DE #7 Order: Discount Rock & Sand, Inc. response due 9/24/2021. (amb)
September 3, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint for Declaratory Judgment re #1 Complaint, by Discount Rock & Sand, Inc.. Attorney Peter Francis Valori added to party Discount Rock & Sand, Inc. (pty:dft). Responses due by 9/17/2021 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Valori, Peter)
August 23, 2021 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by National Indemnity Company of The South (Attachments: #1 Summon(s) Carlos Manso Blanco)(Drawas, Jesse)
August 16, 2021 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by National Indemnity Company of The South (Attachments: #1 Summon(s) DISCOUNT ROCK & SAND, INC)(Drawas, Jesse)
August 9, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to ELIA BONFANTE, FRANCISCO CORTES, Discount Rock & Sand, Inc., JULIO LOPEZ-BERMEJO ROSSELLO, Carlos Manso Blanco, DANIEL PINKERTON, KIMBERLY PINKERTON, RICARDO SANCHEZ. (pes)
August 6, 2021 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Senior Judge Donald L. Graham. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pes)
August 6, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14908432, filed by National Indemnity Company of The South. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s) Discount Rock, #3 Summon(s) Carlos Manso Blanco, #4 Summon(s) D. Pinkerton, #5 Summon(s) Elia Bonfante, #6 Summon(s) Francisco Cortes, #7 Summon(s) Julio Lopez-Bermejo, #8 Summon(s) K. Pinkerton, #9 Summon(s) Ricardo Sanchez)(Drawas, Jesse)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: National Indemnity Company of The South v. Discount Rock & Sand, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Indemnity Company of The South
Represented By: Jesse Daniel Drawas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Discount Rock & Sand, Inc.
Represented By: Peter Francis Valori
Represented By: Patricia Maria Baloyra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlos Manso Blanco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICARDO SANCHEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELIA BONFANTE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FRANCISCO CORTES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JULIO LOPEZ-BERMEJO ROSSELLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANIEL PINKERTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KIMBERLY PINKERTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?