Cable Marine, Inc. v. M/Y MINDSET et al
Plaintiff: Cable Marine, Inc.
Defendant: M/Y MINDSET and Florida Mind Set, LLC
Case Number: 4:2021cv10096
Filed: September 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Roy K Altman
Referring Judge: Lisette M Reid
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF DISMISSAL: Being fully advised, the Court hereby ORDERS that this action is DISMISSED without prejudice. The Clerk shall CLOSE the case. Closing Case. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 10/15/2021. See attached document for full details. (scn)
October 15, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Cable Marine, Inc. (Cooke, Adam)
September 27, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Appoint National Maritime Services, Inc. as Custodian by Cable Marine, Inc.. Responses due by 10/12/2021 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit Consent and Indemnification Agreement)(Cooke, Adam)
September 27, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem by Cable Marine, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Warrant)(Cooke, Adam)
September 24, 2021 Filing 4 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Venue on the Civil Cover Sheet does not match the initiating document. The Clerks Office confirmed Monroe (Office - Key West) as the county with the filer. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (jao)
September 24, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Florida Mind Set, LLC. (jao)
September 24, 2021 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Roy K. Altman and Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jao)
September 24, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15041405, filed by Cable Marine, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Summon(s), #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cooke, Adam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cable Marine, Inc. v. M/Y MINDSET et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cable Marine, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Dewitt McIntosh
Represented By: Adam B. Cooke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M/Y MINDSET
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Florida Mind Set, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?