Lexisnexis Risk And information Analytics Group Inc. et al v. Colangelo Featured Case
Plaintiff: Lexisnexis Risk And information Analytics Group Inc., Reed Elsevier Inc. and Seisint, Inc.
Defendant: Paul Colangelo
Case Number: 9:2007cv80486
Filed: June 6, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Office: West Palm Beach Office
County: Palm Beach
Presiding Judge: Donald M. Middlebrooks
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 19
ORDER granting 18 Motion for Preliminary Injunction ; all pending motions are denied as moot; case is closed;Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 07/09/2007. (bs)
June 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 17
ORDER Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 7/20/2007 10:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Magistrate Judge Linnea R. Johnson.Signed by Magistrate Judge Linnea R. Johnson on 6/21/07.(eg1)
June 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 16
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Linnea R. Johnson to conduct a Scheduling Conference, AND SETTING TRIAL DATE: Trial set for 2/4/2008 09:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks. Status Conference/Calendar Call set for 1/30/2008 01:15 PM before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks.Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 6/19/07.(lh)
June 18, 2007 Filing 12
NOTICE by Lexisnexis Risk And information Analytics Group Inc., Reed Elsevier Inc., Seisint, Inc. re 8 Memorandum in Support,, [9] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Notice of Service via Facsimile) (Cairns, Scott)
June 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 6
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 2 Motion to Expedite Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 6/11/2007. (sw)
June 6, 2007 Filing 5
Summons Issued as to Paul Colangelo. (dj)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lexisnexis Risk And information Analytics Group Inc. et al v. Colangelo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lexisnexis Risk And information Analytics Group Inc.
Represented By: Scott Sanford Cairns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reed Elsevier Inc.
Represented By: Scott Sanford Cairns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Seisint, Inc.
Represented By: Scott Sanford Cairns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Colangelo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?