Cohen v. United States Citizenship & Immigration Services, Miami District
Plaintiff: Sharon Cohen
Defendant: United States Citizenship & Immigration Services, Miami District
Case Number: 9:2007cv81049
Filed: November 6, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Office: West Palm Beach Office
County: Palm Beach
Presiding Judge: James M. Hopkins
Presiding Judge: Daniel T. K. Hurley
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 08:1446 Petition for Naturalization Hearing
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting 16 Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney Fees; sustaining 22 , 28 Plaintiff's objections to Report and Recommendations. Signed by Judge Daniel T. K. Hurley on 3/24/09. (lr)
January 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 28 SUPPLEMENTAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION as to Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney's Fees 16 . It is Hereby Recommended that the District Court DENY Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney's Fees 16 . A party shall serve and file written obje ctions, if any, to this Report and Recommendation with the Honorable Daniel T. K. Hurley, United States District Court Judge for the Southern District of Florida, within ten (10) days of being served with a copy of this Report and Recommendation. Signed by Magistrate Judge James M. Hopkins on 1/12/2009. (tmn)
October 27, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 22 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 16 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Sharon Cohen BE DENIED.Objections to R&R due by 11/13/2008.Signed by Magistrate Judge James M. Hopkins on 10/27/2008. (tmn)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cohen v. United States Citizenship & Immigration Services, Miami District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Cohen
Represented By: Solimar Santos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Citizenship & Immigration Services, Miami District
Represented By: Attorney Immigration Noticing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?