Rothman v. Florida Bar et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Joel B. Rothman
Defendant: Florida Bar and Adria E. Quintela
Case Number: 9:2009cv80503
Filed: March 31, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Office: Civil Rights: Other Office
County: Palm Beach
Presiding Judge: Kenneth L. Ryskamp
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Senior Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 11/16/2009. (ail)
November 13, 2009 Filing 10 STIPULATION of Voluntary Dismissal by Florida Bar, Adria E. Quintela, Joel B. Rothman (ail)
November 13, 2009 Filing 9 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Florida Bar, Adria E. Quintela, Joel B. Rothman. (ail)
July 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. 15 days to appoint mediator.. Signed by Senior Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 7/1/2009. (sh)
July 1, 2009 Filing 7 NOTICE OF TRIAL Bench Trial set for 3/8/2010 09:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Senior Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp. Calendar Call set for 3/3/2010 01:15 PM in West Palm Beach Division before Senior Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp. (sh)
July 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 7/15/2009. Discovery due by 11/15/2009. Joinder of Parties due by 7/15/2009. Motions due by 12/15/2009. Pretrial Stipulation due by 2/24/2009.. Signed by Senior Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 7/1/2009. (sh)
June 29, 2009 Filing 5 SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Joel B. Rothman. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rogow, Bruce) Modified on 6/30/2009 (ls).
June 1, 2009 Filing 4 Defendants' ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Florida Bar, Adria E. Quintela.(Sharpe, Karusha)
April 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF PRETRIAL PROCEDURES. Signed by Senior Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 4/1/2009. (sh)
March 31, 2009 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Florida Bar, Adria E. Quintela. (asl)
March 31, 2009 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Florida Bar, Adria E. Quintela. Filing fee $ 350.00. Receipt#: 545880, filed by Joel B. Rothman.(asl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rothman v. Florida Bar et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joel B. Rothman
Represented By: Bruce S. Rogow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Florida Bar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adria E. Quintela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?